Florentino
Virginia Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Leonie M Brinkema |
Referred: | William E Fitzpatrick |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-00599 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 15:2301 Magnuson-Moss Warranty Act |
Case Filed: | Apr 12, 2024 |
Last checked: Friday Apr 12, 2024 2:12 PM EDT |
Defendant
Kia America, Inc.
|
|
Plaintiff
Miguel Concepcion Florentino
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/01/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Monday, April 22, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
service
Summons Returned Executed
Mon 04/22 9:47 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Miguel Concepcion Florentino Kia America, Inc. served on 4/17/2024, answer due 5/8/2024 (Feinman, James) |
|
Monday, April 15, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
service
Summons Issued
Mon 04/15 1:12 PM
Summons Issued as to Kia America, Inc., NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Please remove the headers and print two duplexed copies of the electronically issued summons for each Defendant. Please serve one copy of the summons and a copy of the Complaint upon each Defendant. Please ensure that your process server returns the service copy (executed or unexecuted) to your attention and electronically file it using the filing events, Summons Returned Executed or Summons Returned Unexecuted. (Dest) |
|
Att: 1 Notice to Attorney | ||
utility
Initial Case Assignment
Mon 04/15 12:46 PM
Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema and Magistrate Judge William E. Fitzpatrick. (Dest) |
||
Friday, April 12, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Proposed Summons
Fri 04/12 2:00 PM
Proposed Summons re1 Complaint by Miguel Concepcion Florentino. (Feinman, James) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Citizenship Disclosure Form
Fri 04/12 1:41 PM
Citizenship Disclosure Form (Local Rule 7.1) by Miguel Concepcion Florentino. (Feinman, James) |
|
1 | 1
6
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Fri 04/12 1:32 PM
Complaint ( Filing fee $ 405, receipt number AVAEDC-9470276.), filed by Miguel Concepcion Florentino.(Feinman, James) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |