CSX TRANSPORTATION, INC. v. Cox Communications Hampton Roads LLC
Virginia Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | David J Novak |
Case #: | 3:24-cv-00271 |
Nature of Suit | 950 Other Statutes - Constitutionality of State Statutes |
Cause | 28:2201 Constitutionality of State Statute(s) |
Case Filed: | Apr 12, 2024 |
Last checked: Friday Apr 12, 2024 2:12 PM EDT |
Defendant
Cox Communications Hampton Roads LLC
|
|
Plaintiff
CSX TRANSPORTATION, INC.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 7 hours ago |
Tuesday, April 16, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Tue 04/16 4:44 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by CSX Transportation, Inc.. Cox Communications Hampton Roads LLC waiver sent on 4/16/2024, answer due 6/17/2024. (McCarthy, Thomas) |
|
Monday, April 15, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Pro hac vice
Mon 04/15 4:42 PM
ORDER granting4 Motion for Pro hac vice. Kathleen Smithgall Lane Appointed for CSX Transportation, Inc. Signed by District Judge David J. Novak on 4/15/2024. (cgar) |
|
8 | 8
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Pro hac vice
Mon 04/15 4:00 PM
ORDER granting3 Motion for Pro hac vice. Gilbert Dickey Appointed for CSX Transportation, Inc. Signed by District Judge David J. Novak on 4/15/2024. (cgar) |
|
7 | 7
2
pgs
order
Order
Mon 04/15 3:07 PM
ORDER - Ordering Notice to Attorney General of Virginia; Providing Certification; Court hereby ORDERS Plaintiff to, within fourteen (14) days of entry of this Order, serve on the Attorney General of Virginia a copy of the Complaint and a notice stating the constitutional questions at issue in the Complaint. Signed by District Judge David J. Novak on 4/15/2024. (cgar) |
|
misc
Notice of Correction
Mon 04/15 3:26 PM
Notice of Correction re:3 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Gilbert C. Dickey, and4 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Kathleen S. Lane; the Pro Hac Vice Application was not properly saved as a PDF fillable form. In the future, to correctly save the PDF fillable form, click on the File menu, select Print, and then select our PDF writer from the Printer Name List, then click on Print or Ok depending on your program. Clerk has properly saved and replaced the Pro Hac Vice Application form. No further action is required at this time. (sbea) |
||
Friday, April 12, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
service
Summons Issued
Fri 04/12 4:35 PM
Summons Issued as to Cox Communications Hampton Roads LLC. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Please remove the headers and print two duplexed copies of the electronically issued summons for each Defendant. Please serve one copy of the summons and a copy of the Complaint upon each Defendant. Please ensure that your process server returns the service copy (executed or unexecuted) to your attention and electronically file it using the filing events, Summons Returned Executed or Summons Returned Unexecuted. (jsmi, ) |
|
5 | 5
misc
Proposed Summons
Fri 04/12 3:03 PM
Proposed Summons by CSX TRANSPORTATION, INC.. (McCarthy, Thomas) (Main Document 5 replaced on 4/12/2024) (jsmi, ) |
|
4 | 4
motion
Pro Hac Vice
Fri 04/12 2:34 PM
Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Kathleen S. Lane and Certification of Local Counsel Thomas R. McCarthy Filing fee $ 75, receipt number AVAEDC-9470551. by CSX TRANSPORTATION, INC.. (McCarthy, Thomas) |
|
3 | 3
motion
Pro Hac Vice
Fri 04/12 2:32 PM
Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Gilbert C. Dickey and Certification of Local Counsel Thomas R. McCarthy Filing fee $ 75, receipt number AVAEDC-9470536. by CSX TRANSPORTATION, INC.. (McCarthy, Thomas) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Fri 04/12 2:22 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by CSX TRANSPORTATION, INC.. (McCarthy, Thomas) |
|
1 | 1
25
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Fri 04/12 2:11 PM
Complaint ( Filing fee $ 405, receipt number AVAEDC-9470386.), filed by CSX TRANSPORTATION, INC..(McCarthy, Thomas) (Attachment 1 replaced on 4/12/2024) (jsmi, ) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Affidavit Declaration of T. McCarthy in Support of Complaint, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibit B | ||
utility
Initial Case Assignment
Fri 04/12 4:32 PM
Initial Case Assignment to District Judge David J. Novak. (jsmi, ) |