Prince William County School Board v. Lassiter et al
Virginia Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Rossie D Alston, Jr |
Referred: | Lindsey R Vaala |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-00610 |
Nature of Suit | 899 Other Statutes - Administrative Procedure Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision |
Cause | 20:1415 Individuals with Disabilities Education Act |
Case Filed: | Apr 12, 2024 |
Last checked: Friday Apr 12, 2024 4:13 PM EDT |
Defendant
Dustin Lassiter
|
|
Defendant
Yesenia Lassiter
|
|
Plaintiff
Prince William County School Board
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 9 hours ago |
Thursday, April 18, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
4
pgs
service
Summons Issued
Thu 04/18 8:36 AM
Summons Issued as to Dustin Lassiter, Yesenia Lassiter, NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Please remove the headers and print two duplexed copies of the electronically issued summons for each Defendant. Please serve one copy of the summons and a copy of the Complaint upon each Defendant. Please ensure that your process server returns the service copy (executed or unexecuted) to your attention and electronically file it using the filing events, Summons Returned Executed or Summons Returned Unexecuted.(swil) |
|
Att: 1 1 pgs Summons Notice | ||
Tuesday, April 16, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
2
pgs
misc
Proposed Summons
Tue 04/16 12:59 PM
Proposed Summons re1 Complaint to Yesenia Lassiter by Prince William County School Board. (Green, Matthew) |
|
4 | 4
2
pgs
misc
Proposed Summons
Tue 04/16 12:58 PM
Proposed Summons re1 Complaint to Dustin Lassiter by Prince William County School Board. (Green, Matthew) |
|
misc
Notice of Correction
Tue 04/16 9:31 AM
Notice of Correction re3 Proposed Summons. The filing user has been notified to file a proposed summons for each defendant. (swil) |
||
Monday, April 15, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
2
pgs
misc
Proposed Summons
Mon 04/15 3:08 PM
Proposed Summons re1 Complaint by Prince William County School Board. (Green, Matthew) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 04/15 3:06 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Brian P Clarke on behalf of Prince William County School Board (Clarke, Brian) |
|
Friday, April 12, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
28
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Fri 04/12 3:47 PM
Complaint ( Filing fee $ 405, receipt number AVAEDC-9470799.), filed by Prince William County School Board.(Green, Matthew) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
utility
Remark
Mon 04/15 9:18 AM
No service issued at this time. (swil) |
||
utility
Initial Case Assignment
Mon 04/15 9:25 AM
Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Rossie D. Alston, Jr and Magistrate Judge Lindsey R. Vaala. (swil) |