Arizona District Court
Judge:Diane J Humetewa
Case #: 2:24-cv-00835
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Cause28:1441 Petition for Removal- Insurance Contract
Case Filed:Apr 12, 2024
Case in other court:Maricopa County Superior Court, CV2024-004701
Last checked: Saturday Oct 12, 2024 3:09 AM MST
Defendant
Liberty Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By
David George Schmidt
Jaburg & Wilk Pc - Phoenix, Az
contact info
Micalann Charlotte Pepe
Jaburg & Wilk Pc - Phoenix, Az
contact info
Plaintiff
Joyce J Stefan
Represented By
John Neal Wilborn
Sl Chapman Llc - Scottsdale, Az
contact info
Bradley Matthew Lakin
Sl Chapman Llc - Scottsdale, Az
contact info


Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Friday, January 31, 2025
20 20 notice Notice of Service of Discovery Fri 01/31 3:48 PM
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Liberty Mutual Insurance Company. (Schmidt, David)
Related: [-]
19 19 notice Notice of Service of Discovery Fri 01/31 2:26 PM
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Joyce J Stefan. (Wilborn, John)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 02, 2025
18 18 order Scheduling Order ~Util - Terminate Hearings Thu 01/02 3:14 PM
RULE 16 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 10/6/2025. Dispositive motions due by 5/1/2026. ORDERED vacating the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 1/6/2025. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 1/2/2025. (See Order for details.) (LFIG)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 30, 2024
17 17 misc Report - Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (Proposed Case Mgt Plan) Mon 12/30 9:12 AM
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Joyce J Stefan.(Wilborn, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Monday, December 09, 2024
16 16 3 pgs order Order on Motion to Stay Mon 12/09 11:16 AM
ORDER that the parties Third Stipulated Motion to Stay (Doc.15 ) is DENIED. The stay in this matter shall be lifted. The parties shall follow the Court's orders set out in its Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference (Doc.8 ) to prepare for the upcoming conference set for January 6, 2025, at 2:00 p.m. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 12/9/2024. (LFIG)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 05, 2024
15 15 motion Stay Thu 12/05 3:48 PM
AMENDED Third MOTION to Stay by Liberty Mutual Insurance Company.(Schmidt, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Wednesday, September 11, 2024
14 14 4 pgs order Order ~Util - Terminate Motions ~Util - Set/Clear Flags ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings Wed 09/11 2:21 PM
ORDER: The parties Amended Second Stipulated Motion to Stay13 is GRANTED. All proceedings in this case shall be stayed for ninety (90) days, or until December 5, 2024. FURTHER ORDERED that the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for September 30, 2024, is VACATED and RESET to January 6, 2025, at 2:00 p.m. The remainder of the Court's Order8 is affirmed. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 9/10/2024. (REK)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 06, 2024
13 13 motion Stay Fri 09/06 8:59 AM
AMENDED Second MOTION to Stay by Liberty Mutual Insurance Company.(Schmidt, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Wednesday, September 04, 2024
12 12 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Stay Wed 09/04 2:13 PM
ORDER that the Second Motion to Stay11 is denied, without prejudice to resubmit with the requisite factual specificity, if done by September 9, 2024. FURTHER ORDERED that the stay in this matter10 shall be lifted and the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for September 30, 202410 is affirmed. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 9/04/2024. (REK)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 03, 2024
11 11 motion Stay Tue 09/03 3:35 PM
Second MOTION to Stay by Liberty Mutual Insurance Company.(Schmidt, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Thursday, June 06, 2024
10 10 3 pgs order Order ~Util - Terminate Motions ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings Thu 06/06 9:27 AM
ORDER: The parties' joint Motion to Stay9 is GRANTED. All proceedings in this case shall be stayed for ninety (90) days, or until September 2, 2024. The Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for June 18, 2024, is VACATED and RESET to September 30, 2024, at 1:30 p.m. The remainder of the Court's Order8 is affirmed. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 6/05/2024. (REK)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 04, 2024
9 9 motion Stay Tue 06/04 1:56 PM
MOTION to Stay by Liberty Mutual Insurance Company.(Schmidt, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Thursday, April 18, 2024
8 8 5 pgs order Order ~Util - Set/Reset Hearings Thu 04/18 1:26 PM
ORDER SETTING RULE 16 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE. Pursuant to Rule 16 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, a Scheduling Conference is set for 6/18/2024 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 605, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge Diane J Humetewa. See attached PDF for complete details . Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 4/16/24. (MJW)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 17, 2024
7 7 notice Notice (Other) Wed 04/17 12:45 PM
NOTICE re: of Service by Joyce J Stefan . (Wilborn, John)
Related: [-]
6 6 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 04/17 12:43 PM
Defendant LM Fire Insurance Company's ANSWER to1 Notice of Removal, by Liberty Mutual Insurance Company.(Schmidt, David)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 16, 2024
5 5 4 pgs order Order re Rule 12(b) Motions Tue 04/16 1:28 PM
ORDER that motions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) are discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motions to determine whether it can be avoided. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff(s) serve a copy of this Order upon Defendant(s) and file a notice of service. See attached Order for complete details. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 4/16/2024. (REK)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 12, 2024
4 4 misc New Case Opened Fri 04/12 1:09 PM
Filing fee paid, receipt number AAZDC-22939745. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Diane J Humetewa. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV 24-00835 PHX-DJH. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (REK)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 04/12 1:03 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Liberty Mutual Insurance Company. (submitted by David Schmidt) (REK)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit
2 2 misc Declaration Fri 04/12 1:01 PM
DECLARATION of David G Schmidt by Defendant Liberty Mutual Insurance Company. (submitted by David Schmidt) (REK)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal Fri 04/12 12:59 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Maricopa County Superior Court, case number CV2024-004701. Filing fee received: $405.00, receipt number AAZDC-22939745 filed by Liberty Mutual Insurance Company. (submitted by David Schmidt)(REK)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 4 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet
***State Court record received on 4/12/2024***SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Liberty Mutual Insurance Company: Certificate of Service re: Summons, Complaint, Jury Demand, and Certificate of Compulsory Arbitration upon Liberty Mutual Insurance Company via Director of Insurance on 3/12/2024.***Certificate of Service by Private Process Server filed in Maricopa County Superior Court on 3/15/2024, docketed in U.S. District Court on 4/12/2024 for case management purposes.*** (REK) This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry.
Related: [-]
service Service Executed Fri 04/12 1:08 PM
***State Court record received on 4/12/2024***SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Liberty Mutual Insurance Company: Certificate of Service re: Summons, Complaint, Jury Demand, and Certificate of Compulsory Arbitration upon Liberty Mutual Insurance Company via Director of Insurance on 3/12/2024.***Certificate of Service by Private Process Server filed in Maricopa County Superior Court on 3/15/2024, docketed in U.S. District Court on 4/12/2024 for case management purposes.*** (REK)
Related: [-]