Michigan Western District Court
Judge:Hala Y Jarbou
Referred: Sally J Berens
Case #: 1:24-cv-00385
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Apr 12, 2024
Terminated:Jun 12, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Oct 13, 2024 5:07 AM EDT
defendant
Calvin University
plaintiff
Joanna Boer
Represented By
Robert Michael Howard
Cunningham Dalman, Pc (gr)
contact info
Sarah Riley Howard
Pinsky Smith, PC
contact info
plaintiff
Wiebe Boer
Represented By
Crystal J. Bultje
Pinsky Smith, PC
contact info
Elizabeth L. Geary
Pinsky Smith, PC
contact info
Robert Michael Howard
Cunningham Dalman, Pc (gr)
contact info
Sarah Riley Howard
Pinsky Smith, PC
contact info


Docket last updated: 44 minutes ago
Wednesday, June 12, 2024
5 5 notice Voluntary Dismissal of Case Wed 06/12 3:58 PM
NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL of case filed by plaintiffs Joanna Boer, Wiebe Boer (Howard, Robert)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 15, 2024
4 4 service Summons Issued Mon 04/15 1:57 PM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendant Calvin University (mg)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Notice Regarding Assignment of Case Mon 04/15 1:56 PM
NOTICE that this case has been assigned to Hala Y. Jarbou (mg)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 12, 2024
2 2 service Proposed Summons (to be issued) Fri 04/12 3:39 PM
PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued re1 (Howard, Sarah)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 04/12 3:36 PM
COMPLAINT with jury demand against Calvin University filed by Wiebe Boer, Joanna Boer (Howard, Sarah)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
misc Filing Fee (Civil Case) - Credit Card Payment Fri 04/12 3:37 PM
FILING FEE PAID re1 by plaintiff Wiebe Boer in the amount of $405, receipt number AMIWDC-7345791 (Howard, Sarah)
Related: [-]
notice Attorney Appearance Fri 04/12 3:44 PM
(NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Robert Michael Howard on behalf of plaintiff Joanna Boer (Howard, Robert)
Related: [-]
notice Attorney Appearance Fri 04/12 3:56 PM
(NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Crystal J. Bultje on behalf of plaintiff Wiebe Boer (Bultje, Crystal)
Related: [-]
notice Attorney Appearance Fri 04/12 4:01 PM
(NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Elizabeth L. Geary on behalf of plaintiff Wiebe Boer (Geary, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]