Illinois Southern District Court
Judge:Stephen P Mcglynn
Case #: 3:24-cv-01096
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Case Filed:Apr 12, 2024
Terminated:Aug 05, 2024
Case in other court:Fourth Judicial Circuit, Effingham County, 2023LA32
Last checked: Saturday Oct 12, 2024 5:29 AM CDT
Defendant
Banner Life Insurance Company
Represented By
Meghan C. Dalton
Clyde & Co Us LLP
contact info
Ambria Mahomes
Faegre Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP
contact info
Michael H Passman
Clyde & Co
contact info
Plaintiff
Robert Thompson
Represented By
Andrew T. Heldut
Mcguire Law, P.C.
contact info
Jordan R. Frysinger
Mcguire Law, P.C.
contact info
Timothy Patrick Kingsbury
Mcguire Law, P.C.
contact info

GPO Aug 05 2024
ORDER: 19 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Defendant Banner Life Insurance Company is GRANTED. Because Plaintiff Robert Thompson cannot state a claim for relief under the Illinois Genetic Information Privacy Act and, therefore, because further amendment of his Amended Complaint would be futile, this action is DISMISSED with prejudice. The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to close this case on the Court's docket. Signed by Judge Stephen P. McGlynn on 8/5/2024. (trf)

Docket last updated: 04/28/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Thursday, September 05, 2024
29 29 appeal USCA Case Number Thu 09/05 1:35 PM
USCA Case Number 24-2563 for25 Notice of Appeal, filed by Robert Thompson.(tkm)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice of Docketing
28 28 appeal Rule 10 Letter Thu 09/05 10:38 AM
Rule 10 Letter (aca)
Related: [-]
27 27 appeal Transmission of Short Record to USCA Thu 09/05 10:29 AM
Transmission of Short Record to US Court of Appeals re25 Notice of Appeal. (aca)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 04, 2024
26 26 appeal Docketing Statement Wed 09/04 7:50 PM
DOCKETING STATEMENT by Robert Thompson re25 Notice of Appeal, (Heldut, Andrew)
Related: [-]
25 25 appeal Notice of Appeal Wed 09/04 7:40 PM
NOTICE OF APPEAL as to24 Clerk's Judgment,23 Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim,, by Robert Thompson. Filing fee $ 605, receipt number AILSDC-5476660.(Heldut, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Memorandum and Order,
Att: 2 Exhibit Judgement
Monday, August 05, 2024
24 24 order Judgment - Clerk Mon 08/05 3:40 PM
CLERK'S JUDGMENT. Approved by Judge Stephen P. McGlynn on 8/5/2024. (trf)
Related: [-]
23 23 14 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Mon 08/05 3:38 PM
ORDER:19 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Defendant Banner Life Insurance Company is GRANTED . Because Plaintiff Robert Thompson cannot state a claim for relief under the Illinois Genetic Information Privacy Act and, therefore, because further amendment of his Amended Complaint would be futile, this action is DISMISSED with prejudice . The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to close this case on the Court's docket. Signed by Judge Stephen P. McGlynn on 8/5/2024. (trf)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 24, 2024
22 22 respm Reply Wed 07/24 3:14 PM
REPLY filed by Banner Life Insurance Company.(Dalton, Meghan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - 5.31.2024 Report of Proceedings
Thursday, July 11, 2024
21 21 18 pgs respm Memorandum in Opposition to Motion Thu 07/11 6:39 PM
MEMORANDUM in Opposition re19 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Robert Thompson.(Heldut, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit D
Thursday, June 27, 2024
20 20 21 pgs respm Memorandum in Support of Motion Thu 06/27 12:55 PM
MEMORANDUM in Support re19 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Banner Life Insurance Company.(Dalton, Meghan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
19 19 2 pgs motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Thu 06/27 12:51 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Banner Life Insurance Company. (Dalton, Meghan)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 13, 2024
18 18 order Order ~Util - Terminate Motions Thu 06/13 1:31 PM
ORDER: Before the Court is16 Amended Complaint filed by Plaintiff Robert Thompson as a matter of course pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 15(a)(1). ( See Doc. 17). In accordance with Local Rule 15.1(b)(3),13 Motion to Dismiss filed by Defendant Banner Life Insurance Company is therefore DENIED as moot . Signed by Judge Stephen P. McGlynn on 6/13/2024. (trf)
Related: [-]
17 17 notice Notice (Other) Thu 06/13 12:41 PM
NOTICE by Robert Thompson re16 Amended Complaint (Heldut, Andrew)
Related: [-]
16 16 13 pgs cmp Amended Complaint Thu 06/13 12:36 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT First Amended Class Action Complaint against Banner Life Insurance Company, filed by Robert Thompson.(Heldut, Andrew)
Related: [-]
15 15 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 06/13 12:22 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew T. Heldut on behalf of Robert Thompson (Heldut, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 31, 2024
14 14 24 pgs respm Memorandum in Support of Motion Fri 05/31 3:51 PM
MEMORANDUM in Support re13 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Banner Life Insurance Company. (Dalton, Meghan)
Related: [-]
13 13 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Fri 05/31 3:49 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Banner Life Insurance Company. (Dalton, Meghan)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 28, 2024
12 12 order Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney Tue 05/28 8:04 AM
ORDER:11 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney is GRANTED . Attorney Timothy Patrick Kingsbury terminated as counsel of record for Plaintiff Robert Thompson. Plaintiff Thompson will continue to be represented by attorneys Andrew T. Heldut and Jordan R. Frysinger. Signed by Judge Stephen P. McGlynn on 5/28/2024. (trf)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 24, 2024
11 11 motion Withdraw as Attorney Fri 05/24 5:04 PM
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Robert Thompson. (Kingsbury, Timothy)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 09, 2024
10 10 notice Notice Terminating Judge Assignment Thu 05/09 9:42 AM
NOTICE TERMINATING JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Pursuant to Administrative Order Nos. 347 and 367, and a request for reassignment having been received, this case, in its entirety, is hereby reassigned to District Judge Stephen P. McGlynn for further proceedings. District Judge J. Phil Gilbert no longer assigned to the case. All future documents must bear case number 24-1096 SPM. (aca)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 07, 2024
9 9 notice Notice Terminating Judge Assignment Tue 05/07 9:36 AM
NOTICE TERMINATING JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Pursuant to Administrative Order Nos. 347 and 367, and a request for reassignment having been received, this case, in its entirety, is hereby reassigned to District Judge J. Phil Gilbert for further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Gilbert C. Sison no longer assigned to the case. All future documents must bear case number 24-1096 JPG. (aca)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 06, 2024
8 8 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 05/06 4:26 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Michael H Passman on behalf of Banner Life Insurance Company (Passman, Michael)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 05/06 4:21 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Meghan C. Dalton on behalf of Banner Life Insurance Company (Dalton, Meghan)
Related: [-]
6 6 misc Consent/Non-Consent to US Magistrate Judge Mon 05/06 12:35 PM
CONSENT/NON-CONSENT TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE - sealed pending receipt from all parties. (Mahomes, Ambria)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 18, 2024
5 5 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Thu 04/18 10:21 AM
ORDER granting4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant's answer due on or before May 31, 2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gilbert C. Sison on 4/18/2024. (kbh)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 17, 2024
4 4 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Wed 04/17 7:59 AM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer (Unopposed) by Banner Life Insurance Company. (Mahomes, Ambria)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 15, 2024
3 3 notice Notice of Initial Magistrate Assignment Mon 04/15 8:30 AM
NOTICE OF INITIAL ASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE: This case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Gilbert C. Sison pursuant to Administrative Orders 347 and 367. The parties are advised that their consent is required if the assigned Magistrate Judge is to conduct all further proceedings in this case, including trial and final entry of judgment pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 73. As set forth in Administrative Order Nos. 347 and 367, each party will be required to file a Notice and Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form indicating consent or non-consent to the jurisdiction of the assigned Magistrate Judge. If all parties do not consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction, the case will be randomly assigned to a district judge for all further proceedings and the parties cannot later consent to reassignment of the case to a magistrate judge. The parties are further advised that they are free to withhold consent without adverse substantive consequences. Within 21 days of this Notice, the following party or parties must file the attached form indicating consent to proceed before the assigned Magistrate Judge or an affirmative declination to consent: Banner Life Insurance Company. A link regarding the magistrate judges in this district is attached for your convenience:[LINK:https://www.ilsd.uscourts.gov/sites/ilsd/files/BenefitsofConsent.pdf] . All future documents must bear case number 24-1096 GCS. Refer to Civil/Removal Case Processing Requirements, found on the ILSD website, for further service information. Consent due by 5/6/2024 (aca)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 12, 2024
2 2 misc Disclosure Statement Fri 04/12 5:05 PM
Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1 Disclosure Statement by Banner Life Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Legal & General America, Inc., Corporate Parent Legal & General Overseas Operations Ltd., Corporate Parent Legal & General Group Plc for Banner Life Insurance Company. (Mahomes, Ambria)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Fri 04/12 4:46 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Fourth Judicial Circuit, Effingham County, case number 2023LA32 ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number AILSDC-5364759), filed by Banner Life Insurance Company.(Mahomes, Ambria)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - state court Waiver of Service,
Att: 2 12 pgs Exhibit B - state court Complaint,
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Declaration of Ambria Mahomes,
Att: 4 Exhibit D - state court docket sheet,
Att: 5 Civil Cover Sheet