99
|
|
99
order
Amended/Corrected Order
Fri 05/03 4:49 PM
Corrected Order Related [+]. Signed on 5/3/2024 (Cox, Adam)
|
98
|
|
98
misc
Proposed Order
Fri 05/03 4:41 PM
Proposed Order - Corrected Order: (a) Approving Sale Process, Including a Stalking Horse Asset Purchase Agreement; (b) Approving Procedures for Assumption and Assignment of Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases; (c) Approving Form Notices; (d) Excusing Page Limit; and (e) Scheduling a Public Auction and a Sale Approval Hearing Filed by Alexander F Brougham on behalf of Oberweis Dairy, Inc. Related [+]. (Brougham, Alexander)
|
97
|
|
97
order
Scheduling
Fri 05/03 4:21 PM
Order (a) Approving Sale Process, Including a Stalking Horse Asset Purchase Agreement; (b) Approving Procedures for Assumption and Assignment of Executory Contracts and Unexpired Lease; (c) Approving Form Notices; (d) Excusing Page Limit; and (e) Scheduling a Public Auction and a Sale Approval Hearing Related [+]. Objections due by 6/3/2024. Sale Hearing scheduled for 6/5/2024 at 01:00 PM at Appear In Courtroom 644, 219 S. Dearborn St, Chicago, IL 60604 or Using Zoom- Judge Cleary. Signed on 5/3/2024 (Cox, Adam)
|
96
|
|
96
court
Hearing Continued (Motion)
Fri 05/03 4:16 PM
(E)Hearing Continued Related [+]. hearing scheduled for 06/05/2024 at 01:00 PM at Appear in Courtroom 644, 219 S. Dearborn St, Chicago, IL 60604, or Using Zoom - Judge Cleary. (Beckerman, Steve)
|
95
|
|
95
notice
4-Notice of Filing
Fri 05/03 2:18 PM
Notice of Filing - Redline of Sale Procedures Order Filed by Alexander F Brougham on behalf of Oberweis Dairy, Inc.. (Brougham, Alexander)
Related: [-]
|
94
|
|
94
misc
Proposed Order
Fri 05/03 2:04 PM
Proposed Order - Order: (a) Approving Sale Process, Including a Stalking Horse Asset Purchase Agreement; (b) Approving Procedures for Assumption and Assignment of Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases; (c) Approving Form Notices; (d) Excusing Page Limit; and (e) Scheduling a Public Auction and a Sale Approval Hearing Filed by Alexander F Brougham on behalf of Oberweis Dairy, Inc. Related [+]. (Brougham, Alexander)
|
93
|
|
93
misc
Certificate of Service (Do Not Use for Service of Summons or Rule 3002.1 Events)
Thu 05/02 8:57 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by CPT Group, Inc. (Green, Julie)
Related: [-]
|
92
|
|
92
misc
Certificate of Service (Do Not Use for Service of Summons or Rule 3002.1 Events)
Thu 05/02 8:51 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by CPT Group, Inc. (Green, Julie)
Related: [-]
|
91
|
|
91
misc
Appearance
Thu 05/02 9:48 AM
Appearance Filed by Paul B. Poracky on behalf of Schererville Main Street, LLC. (Poracky, Paul)
Related: [-]
|
90
|
|
90
order
Appointment of Ombudsman
Thu 05/02 6:14 AM
Order Granting Motion for Appointment of Ombudsman Related [+]. Signed on 5/1/2024. (Batson, Nicole)
|
89
|
|
89
motion
Set Bar Date for Filing Proofs of Claim
Wed 05/01 8:42 PM
Notice of Motion and Motion to Set Bar Date for Filing Proofs of Claim Filed by Tevin D. Bowens on behalf of Oberweis Dairy, Inc.. Hearing scheduled for 5/8/2024 at 11:00 AM at Appear In Courtroom 644, 219 S. Dearborn St, Chicago, IL 60604 or Using Zoom- Judge Cleary. (Bowens, Tevin)
Related: [-]
|
| |
Att: 1
Proposed Order
|
88
|
|
88
court
Hearing Continued (Motion)
Wed 05/01 3:16 PM
(E)D.O.T.F. - Hearing Continued Related [+]. hearing scheduled for 05/08/2024 at 11:00 AM at Appear in Courtroom 644, 219 S. Dearborn St, Chicago, IL 60604, or Using Zoom - Judge Cleary. (Beckerman, Steve)
|
87
|
|
87
court
Hearing Continued (Motion)
Wed 05/01 3:16 PM
(E)Hearing Continued Related [+]. hearing scheduled for 05/08/2024 at 11:00 AM at Appear in Courtroom 644, 219 S. Dearborn St, Chicago, IL 60604, or Using Zoom - Judge Cleary. (Beckerman, Steve)
|
86
|
|
86
misc
Appearance
Wed 05/01 11:41 AM
Appearance Filed by Daniel Brown on behalf of Oberweis-Manion Rev Trust, James W. Oberweis Legacy Trust, James W. Oberweis Living Trust, Joseph S. Oberweis Omega Trust, James D. Oberweis Legacy Trust II, James D. Oberweis Living Trust, Janet Clark, Jennifer Roberts, Tricia Oberweis, Joseph Oberweis, Julie Oberweis, James D Oberweis Jr, James D Oberweis. (Brown, Daniel)
Related: [-]
|
85
|
|
85
misc
Certificate of Service (Do Not Use for Service of Summons or Rule 3002.1 Events)
Wed 05/01 10:01 AM
Certificate of Service Filed by U.S. Trustee Patrick S Layng Related [+]. (Gansberg, Jeffrey)
|
84
|
|
84
notice
Notice
Wed 05/01 9:59 AM
Notice of Meeting of Creditors to be conducted via Microsoft Teams Filed by U.S. Trustee Patrick S Layng. (Gansberg, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
|
83
|
|
83
misc
Agenda
Tue 04/30 9:47 PM
Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing on May 1, 2024, at 11:00 a.m. Filed by Alexander F Brougham on behalf of Oberweis Dairy, Inc.. (Brougham, Alexander)
Related: [-]
|
82
|
|
82
38
pgs
notice
4-Notice of Filing
Tue 04/30 9:38 PM
Notice of Filing - Redline of Proposed Sale Procedures Order Filed by Alexander F Brougham on behalf of Oberweis Dairy, Inc.. (Brougham, Alexander)
Related: [-]
|
81
|
|
81
34
pgs
misc
Proposed Order
Tue 04/30 9:29 PM
Proposed Order - Order: (a) Approving Sale Process, Including a Stalking Horse Asset Purchase Agreement; (b) Approving Procedures for Assumption and Assignment of Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases; (c) Approving Form Notices; (d) Excusing Page Limit; and (e) Scheduling a Public Auction and a Sale Approval Hearing Filed by Alexander F Brougham on behalf of Oberweis Dairy, Inc. Related [+]. (Brougham, Alexander)
|
80
|
|
80
12
pgs
answer
Objection
Tue 04/30 4:42 PM
Objection to Related [+] Filed by Aaron B Chapin on behalf of BMO Bank N.A. (Chapin, Aaron)
|
| |
Att: 1
Exhibit A - First Loan Agreeement
|
| |
Att: 2
Exhibit B - Second Loan Agreement
|
| |
Att: 3
Exhibit C - Certificates of Titles for the Collateral
|
79
|
|
79
misc
Certificate of Service (Do Not Use for Service of Summons or Rule 3002.1 Events)
Tue 04/30 2:34 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Tevin D. Bowens on behalf of Oberweis Dairy, Inc. Related [+]. (Bowens, Tevin)
|
78
|
|
78
misc
Appearance
Tue 04/30 10:50 AM
Appearance Filed by Robert Jeffrey Haupt on behalf of Osprey Capital, LLC. (Haupt, Robert)
Related: [-]
|
77
|
|
77
utility
U - Corrective Entry
Tue 04/30 10:34 AM
CORRECTIVE ENTRY: PDF/Event Error, Filer Notified Related [+]. (Gomez, Denise)
|
76
|
|
76
misc
Request for Service of Notices
Mon 04/29 6:33 PM
Request for Service of Notices Filed by Edmund G Urban III on behalf of Urban Communications, Inc.. (Urban, Edmund)
Related: [-]
|
75
|
|
75
misc
Appearance
Mon 04/29 4:16 PM
Appearance Filed by Debra Devassy Babu on behalf of Wells Fargo Equipment Finance, Inc.. (Babu, Debra)
Related: [-]
|
74
|
|
74
answer
Objection
Mon 04/29 3:55 PM
Limited Objection to Related [+] Filed by Aaron B Chapin on behalf of BMO Bank N.A. (Chapin, Aaron)
|
| |
Att: 1
Exhibit A - C
|
73
|
|
73
notice
Notice of Objection (Text Only)
Mon 04/29 3:24 PM
Notice of Objection Filed by Aaron B Chapin on behalf of BMO Bank N.A. Related [+]. (Chapin, Aaron)
|
72
|
|
72
notice
Notice of Objection (Text Only)
Mon 04/29 2:31 PM
Notice of Objection Filed by U.S. Trustee Patrick S Layng Related [+]. (Gansberg, Jeffrey)
|
71
|
|
71
misc
Appearance
Mon 04/29 10:21 AM
Appearance Filed by Aaron B Chapin on behalf of BMO Bank N.A.. (Chapin, Aaron)
Related: [-]
|
70
|
|
70
notice
Notice
Mon 04/29 10:18 AM
Notice Perfection of Mechanic's Lien Filed by Raymond J Ostler on behalf of Associated Electrical Contractors, LLC. (Ostler, Raymond)
Related: [-]
|
| |
Att: 1
Exhibit Claim for Lien
|
69
|
|
69
notice
4-Notice of Filing
Mon 04/29 8:38 AM
Notice of Filing Order Granting Motion For Adequate Assurance Filed by Tevin D. Bowens on behalf of Oberweis Dairy, Inc.. (Bowens, Tevin)
Related: [-]
|
68
|
|
68
misc
Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor (Form 2030)
Fri 04/26 4:46 PM
Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor Filed by Alexander F Brougham on behalf of Oberweis Dairy, Inc.. (Brougham, Alexander)
Related: [-]
|
67
|
|
67
notice
Notice of Objection (Text Only)
Fri 04/26 4:32 PM
Notice of Objection Filed by Steve Jakubowski on behalf of Official Unsecured Creditors' Committee Related [+]. (Jakubowski, Steve)
|
66
|
|
66
misc
Appearance
Fri 04/26 4:03 PM
Appearance for Joseph A. Archambeau Filed by Travis J Eliason on behalf of TSC Equipment Finance LLC. (Eliason, Travis)
Related: [-]
|
65
|
|
65
misc
Appearance
Fri 04/26 3:49 PM
Appearance Filed by Travis J Eliason on behalf of TSC Equipment Finance LLC. (Eliason, Travis)
Related: [-]
|
64
|
|
64
misc
List of Equity Security Holders
Fri 04/26 3:24 PM
List of Equity Security Holders Filed by Alexander F Brougham on behalf of Oberweis Dairy, Inc.. (Brougham, Alexander)
Related: [-]
|
63
|
|
63
misc
Appearance
Fri 04/26 2:39 PM
Appearance Filed by Richard C Perna on behalf of Park Ridge Plaza, LLC. (Perna, Richard)
Related: [-]
|
62
|
|
62
misc
Appearance
Fri 04/26 2:36 PM
Appearance Filed by R Scott Alsterda on behalf of Ecolab, Inc.. (Alsterda, R)
Related: [-]
|
61
|
|
61
misc
Appearance
Fri 04/26 11:25 AM
Appearance Filed by Bryan E. Minier on behalf of Osprey Capital, LLC. (Minier, Bryan)
Related: [-]
|