Leonard v. Apple Inc.
California Northern District Court | |
Judge: | James Donato |
Case #: | 3:24-cv-02156 |
Nature of Suit | 410 Other Statutes - Antitrust |
Cause | 15:1 Antitrust Litigation |
Case Filed: | Apr 10, 2024 |
Last checked: Sunday Apr 14, 2024 1:48 AM PDT |
Defendant
Apple Inc.
|
|
Plaintiff
Thomas Leonard
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/30/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Tuesday, April 30, 2024 | ||
17 | 17
order
Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice
Tue 04/30 5:40 AM
ORDER by Judge James Donato granting 15 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (lrc, COURT STAFF) |
|
Monday, April 29, 2024 | ||
16 | 16
misc
Stipulation without Proposed Order
Mon 04/29 5:50 PM
STIPULATION to Suspend the Deadline for Defendant to Respond to Complaint filed by Apple Inc.. (Richman, Cynthia) |
|
15 | 15
motion
Pro Hac Vice
Mon 04/29 5:46 PM
MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 328, receipt number ACANDC-19367345.) filed by Apple Inc..(Richman, Cynthia) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Good Standing | ||
14 | 14
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 04/29 5:42 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Glen Swanson (Swanson, Daniel) |
|
Friday, April 19, 2024 | ||
13 | 13
service
Summons Returned Executed
Fri 04/19 3:54 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Thomas Leonard. Apple Inc. served on 4/16/2024, answer due 5/7/2024. (Rubin, Michael) |
|
Thursday, April 18, 2024 | ||
12 | 12
notice
Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures
Thu 04/18 9:47 AM
Certificate of Interested Entities by Thomas Leonard (Johnson, Corinne) |
|
Monday, April 15, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
order
Case Management Scheduling Order
Mon 04/15 6:36 AM
CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/11/2024 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor. Case Management Statement due by 7/3/2024. Signed by Judge James Donato on 4/15/2024. (lrc, COURT STAFF) |
|
Friday, April 12, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
1
pgs
order
Order Reassigning Case ~Util - Case Assigned/Reassigned
Fri 04/12 2:55 PM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge James Donato for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins no longer assigned to case. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.(sfb, COURT STAFF) |
|
Att: 1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording | ||
9 | 9
oth_evt
Clerk's Notice of Impending Reassignment - Text Only
Fri 04/12 1:46 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND WILL BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (lmh, COURT STAFF) |
|
Thursday, April 11, 2024 | ||
8 | 8 Summons Issued as to Apple Inc.. (far, COURT STAFF) | |
7 | 7 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Thomas Leonard.. (Johnson, Corinne) | |
6 | 6 Proposed Summons. (Johnson, Corinne) | |
5 | 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 7/3/2024. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/10/2024 10:00 AM in San Jose, - Telephonic Only. (far, COURT STAFF) | |
4 | 4 NOTICE of Appearance by James M. Finberg (Finberg, James) | |
3 | 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Corinne F Johnson (Johnson, Corinne) | |
Wednesday, April 10, 2024 | ||
2 | 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 4/24/2024. (kmg, COURT STAFF) | |
1 | 1 45 pgs COMPLAINT against Apple Inc. ( Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ACANDC-19308761.). Filed by Thomas Leonard.(Rubin, Michael) | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |