Demir v. Mayorkas et al
California Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Joseph C Spero |
Case #: | 3:24-cv-02209 |
Nature of Suit | 465 Immigration - Other Immigration Actions |
Cause | 28:1361 Petition for Writ of Mandamus |
Case Filed: | Apr 12, 2024 |
Last checked: Saturday Apr 13, 2024 1:17 AM PDT |
Defendant
Emilia Bardini
Director USCIS San Francisco Asylum Office 75 Hawthorne St Seventh Floor
San Francisco, CA 94105 |
|
Defendant
Merrick B. Garland
Attorney General of the United States U.S. Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530 |
|
Defendant
UR Mendoza Jaddou
Director U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services 20 Massachusetts Avenue NW
Washington, DC 20001 |
|
Defendant
Alejandro Mayorkas
Secretary of Homeland Security 245 Murray Lane, S.W.
Washington, DC 20528 |
|
Plaintiff
Osman Demir
12004 31ST Ave NE
Seattle, WA 98125 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/30/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Wednesday, April 17, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
service
Summons Issued as to USA
Wed 04/17 9:14 AM
Summons Issued as to Emilia Bardini, Merrick B. Garland, UR Mendoza Jaddou, Alejandro Mayorkas.(mcl, COURT STAFF) |
|
6 | 6
order
Immigration Mandamus Case Procedural Order
Wed 04/17 8:57 AM
Immigration Mandamus Case Procedural Order. (mcl, COURT STAFF) |
|
Tuesday, April 16, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
utility
~Util - Case Assigned by Intake
Tue 04/16 3:13 PM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 4/30/2024. (kmg, COURT STAFF) |
|
Monday, April 15, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Civil Cover Sheet
Mon 04/15 9:55 AM
Civil Cover Sheet by Osman Demir . (Sabzwari, Ali) |
|
utility
Electronic Filing Error
Mon 04/15 7:55 AM
[LINK:Electronic filing error] . Civil Cover Sheet missing. No judge assignment will be made until the document is e-filed. Submit your document using Civil Events > Other Filings > Other Documents > Civil Cover SheetThis filing will not be processed by the clerks office.Please re-file in its entirety. Re:1 Complaint filed by Osman Demir (kmg, COURT STAFF) |
||
Friday, April 12, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge
Fri 04/12 7:46 PM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Osman Demir.. (Sabzwari, Ali) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Proposed Summons
Fri 04/12 7:36 PM
Proposed Summons. (Sabzwari, Ali) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 04/12 7:29 PM
COMPLAINT Writ of Mandamus against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ACANDC-19317488.). Filed by Osman Demir.(Sabzwari, Ali) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit all exhibits |