North Dakota Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Shon Hastings
Case #: 3:24-bk-30152
Case Filed:Apr 15, 2024
Dismissed:Feb 28, 2025

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$100,001 to $500,000
Est. Liabilities $1,000,001 to $10 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
The Fargo Brewing Company, LLC
610 University Dr N Ste 104
Fargo, ND 58102-4333
Represented By
Caren W. Stanley
Vogel Law Firm
contact info
Drew J. Hushka
Vogel Law Firm
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
Robert B. Raschke
Assistant U.S. Trustee Suite 1015 U.S. Courthouse 300 South Fourth Street
Minneapolis, MN 55415
Represented By
Sarah J. Wencil
Office Of The U.S. Trustee
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/28/2025 12:02 PM CDT
Friday, April 11, 2025
281 281 order Compensation Fri 04/11 8:45 AM
Order Approving First and Final Application for Allowance of Fees and Reimbursement of Costs for Attorney for the Debtor Fargo Brewing Company, LLC for Caren W. Stanley and Vogel Law Firm Related [+]. The Court approves $79,497.00 in fees and $2,287.18 in expenses. Debtors counsel is authorized to apply $1,725.00 from the deposit in trust to the approved fees and expenses. The remaining balance of $80,059.18 in fees and expenses is approved under 11 U.S.C. § 330 and allowed as an administrative expense under 11 U.S.C. § 503(b)(2). Ordered by Judge Shon Hastings (Text order only). Signed on 4/11/2025 (vck)
Related: [-] 279