Edwards Management Group, LLC et al v. Zurich American Insurance Company
Arkansas Western District Court | |
Judge: | Timothy L Brooks |
Case #: | 5:24-cv-05087 |
Nature of Suit | 110 Contract - Insurance |
Cause | 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Property Damage |
Case Filed: | Apr 15, 2024 |
Case in other court: | Washington County Circuit Court, 72CV-24-00798 |
Last checked: Thursday May 30, 2024 4:15 AM CDT |
Defendant
Zurich American Insurance Company
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Edwards Management Group, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
ISC Properties, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/19/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Monday, June 24, 2024 | ||
13 | 13
order
Protective Order
Mon 06/24 7:45 AM
PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on June 24, 2024. (bjb) |
|
Tuesday, June 18, 2024 | ||
12 | 12
1
pgs
order
Order Setting/Resetting Hearings
Tue 06/18 3:13 PM
ORDER Setting Hearings: Settlement Conference set for 7/1/2025 09:00 AM in Fayetteville - 2nd flr (Rm 210) before Honorable Christy D. Comstock. Each party shall provide a concise, confidential settlement statement NO LATER THAN ONE WEEK PRIOR TO THE SCHEDULED CONFERENCE via email to CDCsettle@arwd.uscourts.gov. Signed by Honorable Christy D. Comstock on June 18, 2024. (rg) |
|
11 | 11
order
Final Scheduling Order
Tue 06/18 7:17 AM
CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Pretrial Conference set for 8/8/2025 09:00 AM in Fayetteville -- 5th flr (Rm 509) before Honorable Timothy L. Brooks. JURY TRIAL set for 8/18/2025 09:00 AM in Fayetteville -- 5th flr (Rm 509) before Honorable Timothy L. Brooks. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on June 18, 2024. (slc) |
|
Monday, June 17, 2024 | ||
order
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings
Mon 06/17 9:22 AM
***CASE MANAGEMENT HEARING set for 6/20/2024 TERMINATED. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on June 17, 2024. (slc) |
||
Friday, May 31, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting
Fri 05/31 2:02 PM
JOINT REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Zurich American Insurance Company. (Stallings, Mark) |
|
Wednesday, May 15, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement - Filed by Attorney
Wed 05/15 10:46 AM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Edwards Management Group, LLC. (Woods, Rick) |
|
Friday, April 26, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 04/26 4:21 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph Cotten Cunningham on behalf of Zurich American Insurance Company. (Cunningham, Joseph) |
|
7 | 7
order
Initial Scheduling Order
Fri 04/26 9:35 AM
INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Hearing set for 6/20/2024 01:30 PM in Fayetteville -- 5th flr (Rm 509) before Honorable Timothy L. Brooks. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 5/31/2024. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on April 26, 2024. (slc) |
|
Monday, April 15, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Magistrate Notice/Consent Form
Mon 04/15 2:03 PM
Magistrate Notice/Consent Form (bjb) |
|
5 | 5
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Mon 04/15 2:02 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Zurich American Insurance Company. (bjb) |
|
4 | 4
answer
Answer to Complaint
Mon 04/15 1:58 PM
STATE COURT ANSWER to3 Complaint by Zurich American Insurance Company.(bjb) |
|
3 | 3
cmp
Complaint
Mon 04/15 1:57 PM
STATE COURT COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Zurich American Insurance Company, filed by Edwards Management Group, LLC, ISC Properties, LLC.(bjb) |
|
2 | 2
cmp
Notice of Removal
Mon 04/15 1:55 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Washington County Circuit Court, case number 72CV-24-798, filed by Zurich American Insurance Company.(bjb) |
|
Att: 1 State Court Complaint, | ||
Att: 2 State Court Summons, | ||
Att: 3 Afd of Service, | ||
Att: 4 State Court Answer | ||
1 | 1
misc
Civil Cover Sheet
Mon 04/15 1:52 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET by Zurich American Insurance Company. (bjb) |
|
notice
Clerk's Notice Regarding Filing Fee
Mon 04/15 2:03 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE REGARDING FILING FEE. The following document was received and filed without the appropriate filing fee:2 Notice of Removal. You MUST pay the filing fee of $405.00 or file a motion to proceed In Forma Pauperis, if appropriate, within 2 business days. If the proper fees or motion are not received for case initiating documents, your case may be subject to dismissal. Present your payment to the appropriate Divisional Office or Pay Online, using the Civil -> Other Documents -> Filing Fee Submitted event. Filing Fee due by 4/17/2024 (bjb) |
||
misc
Filing Fee Submitted
Mon 04/15 4:57 PM
Notice of Removal filing fee paid re2 Notice of Removal, Clerk's Notice Regarding Filing Fee,, : $ 405, receipt number AARWDC-2961398.. (Stallings, Mark) |