Llarenas v. Jacobs Technology, Inc. et al
Virginia Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Jamar K Walker |
Referred: | Lawrence R Leonard |
Case #: | 4:24-cv-00061 |
Nature of Suit | 360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Apr 15, 2024 |
Case in other court: | Hampton City Circuit Court, CL24-556 |
Last checked: Monday Apr 15, 2024 5:17 PM EDT |
Defendant
Shane Chambers
|
|
Defendant
Michael Fulgham
|
|
Defendant
Jacobs
|
|
Defendant
Jacobs Technology, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Robert Rice
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Thomas Watkins
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jaime Llarenas
|
Docket last updated: 2 hours ago |
Friday, April 26, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice (other)
Fri 04/26 3:37 PM
Clerk's NOTICE to Counsel. Status report due within 15 days. (jhie, ) |
|
Wednesday, April 17, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Citizenship Disclosure Form
Wed 04/17 4:49 PM
Citizenship Disclosure Form (Local Rule 7.1) by Jacobs Technology, Inc., Robert Rice, Thomas Watkins. (Snyder, James) |
|
Tuesday, April 16, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
respoth
Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal)
Tue 04/16 2:12 PM
COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Jacobs Technology, Inc., Robert Rice, Thomas Watkins. (epri, ) |
|
3 | 3
utility
Mag Notice / Judge Information
Tue 04/16 2:10 PM
Magistrate Judge Notice and Judge's Information to counsel. (epri, ) |
|
misc
Notice of Correction
Tue 04/16 2:13 PM
Notice of Correction re1 Notice of Removal. Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1, a Citizenship Disclosure Form should be filed in any case noting a diversity of citizenship jurisdiction. The form can be found on our internet site and should promptly be filed. (epri, ) |
||
Monday, April 15, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Mon 04/15 4:52 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Jacobs Technology, Inc.. (Snyder, James) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Notice of Removal
Mon 04/15 4:51 PM
Notice of Removal ( Filing fee $ 405, receipt number CVAEDC-9473484.), filed by Thomas Watkins, Robert Rice, Jacobs Technology, Inc..(Snyder, James) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - State Court Complaint, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B - State Court Answer, | ||
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
utility
Initial Case Assignment
Tue 04/16 2:09 PM
Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Jamar K. Walker and Magistrate Judge Lawrence R. Leonard. (epri, ) |