Hughes v. Early Warning Services, LLC.
Virginia Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Elizabeth W Hanes |
Referred: | Douglas E Miller |
Case #: | 4:24-cv-00060 |
Nature of Suit | 480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit |
Cause | 15:1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act |
Case Filed: | Apr 15, 2024 |
Last checked: Monday Apr 15, 2024 5:17 PM EDT |
Defendant
Early Warning Services, LLC.
|
|
Plaintiff
Lloyd Hughes, Jr.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 8 hours ago |
Wednesday, May 01, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
service
Summons Returned Executed
Wed 05/01 4:28 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lloyd Hughes, Jr Early Warning Services, LLC. served on 4/19/2024, answer due 6/10/2024 (Bennett, Leonard) |
|
Tuesday, April 30, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Tue 04/30 12:00 PM
ORDER re5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. It is hereby ORDERED that the Consent Motion is GRANTED; and it is further ORDERED that EWS shall have up to and including June 10, 2024, to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Class Action Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Miller on 4/30/2024. (Vpea) |
|
Monday, April 29, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Financial Disclosure Statement
Mon 04/29 9:56 AM
Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Early Warning Services, LLC.. (Anthony, David) |
|
5 | 5
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Mon 04/29 9:55 AM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Early Warning Services, LLC..(Anthony, David) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A (Proposed Order) | ||
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 04/29 9:50 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth Mara Briones on behalf of Early Warning Services, LLC. (Briones, Elizabeth) |
|
utility
Motions Referred
Mon 04/29 12:13 PM
MOTIONS REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Miller.5 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer (Vpea) |
||
Monday, April 15, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
2
pgs
service
Summons Issued
Mon 04/15 4:57 PM
Summons Issued as to Early Warning Services, LLC., NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Please remove the headers and print two duplexed copies of the electronically issued summons for each Defendant. Please serve one copy of the summons and a copy of the Complaint upon each Defendant. Please ensure that your process server returns the service copy (executed or unexecuted) to your attention and electronically file it using the filing events, Summons Returned Executed or Summons Returned Unexecuted.(epri, ) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Motions Procedures | ||
2 | 2
misc
Proposed Summons
Mon 04/15 4:26 PM
Proposed Summons re1 Complaint by Lloyd Hughes, Jr., for himself and all other similarly situated individuals. (Bennett, Leonard) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 04/15 4:25 PM
Complaint ( Filing fee $ 405, receipt number AVAEDC-9473385.), filed by Lloyd Hughes, Jr., for himself and all other similarly situated individuals.(Bennett, Leonard) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
utility
Initial Case Assignment
Mon 04/15 4:50 PM
Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Elizabeth W. Hanes and Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Miller. (epri, ) |