S. v. Fairfax County School Board
Virginia Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Michael S Nachmanoff |
Referred: | Ivan D Davis |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-00622 |
Nature of Suit | 446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other |
Cause | 20:1400 Civil Rights of Handicapped Child |
Case Filed: | Apr 15, 2024 |
Last checked: Monday Apr 15, 2024 6:13 PM EDT |
Defendant
Fairfax County School Board
|
|
Plaintiff
M. S.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 33 minutes ago |
Monday, April 29, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
service
Summons Returned Executed
Mon 04/29 1:42 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by M. S. All Defendants (Sutter, Matthew) |
|
Wednesday, April 17, 2024 | ||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Wed 04/17 12:11 PM
Case Reassigned to District Judge Michael S Nachmanoff. District Judge Patricia Tolliver Giles no longer assigned to the case. (jlan) |
||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Wed 04/17 12:26 PM
Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis. US Magistrate Judge William B. Porter no longer assigned to the case. (jlan) |
||
Tuesday, April 16, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
service
Summons Issued
Tue 04/16 3:58 PM
Summons Issued as to Fairfax County School Board, NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Please remove the headers and print two duplexed copies of the electronically issued summons for each Defendant. Please serve one copy of the summons and a copy of the Complaint upon each Defendant. Please ensure that your process server returns the service copy (executed or unexecuted) to your attention and electronically file it using the filing events, Summons Returned Executed or Summons Returned Unexecuted.(Cwel) |
|
Att: 1 Notice to Attorney | ||
Monday, April 15, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Notice (other)
Mon 04/15 7:28 PM
NOTICE by M. S. re1 Complaint(Sutter, Matthew) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A (corrected) | ||
2 | 2
misc
Proposed Summons
Mon 04/15 6:03 PM
Proposed Summons re1 Complaint by M. S.. (Sutter, Matthew) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 04/15 6:01 PM
Complaint ( Filing fee $ 405, receipt number AVAEDC-9473809.), filed by M. S..(Sutter, Matthew) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
utility
Initial Case Assignment
Tue 04/16 3:45 PM
Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Patricia Tolliver Giles and US Magistrate Judge William B. Porter. (Cwel) |