Waters v. J.B. Hunt Transport Services, Inc.
Arkansas Western District Court | |
Judge: | Timothy L Brooks |
Case #: | 5:24-cv-05089 |
Nature of Suit | 442 Civil Rights - Employment |
Cause | 28:1441 Petition for Removal - Employment Discrimination |
Case Filed: | Apr 15, 2024 |
Case in other court: | Washington County Circuit Clerk, 72CV-24-00896 |
Last checked: Monday Apr 15, 2024 6:10 PM CDT |
Defendant
J.B. Hunt Transport Services, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ryan Waters
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/29/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Friday, April 26, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
order
Initial Scheduling Order
Fri 04/26 9:40 AM
INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Hearing set for 6/20/2024 09:00 AM in Fayetteville -- 5th flr (Rm 509) before Honorable Timothy L. Brooks. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 5/31/2024. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on April 26, 2024. (slc) |
|
Wednesday, April 17, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement - Filed by Attorney
Wed 04/17 4:27 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by J.B. Hunt Transport Services, Inc.. (Hamilton, Audra) |
|
8 | 8
answer
Answer to Complaint
Wed 04/17 4:25 PM
ANSWER to3 Complaint by J.B. Hunt Transport Services, Inc..(Hamilton, Audra) |
|
7 | 7
5
pgs
msupport
Memorandum Brief in Support
Wed 04/17 4:17 PM
MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of Motion for Partial Dismissal by J.B. Hunt Transport Services, Inc.. (Hamilton, Audra) |
|
6 | 6
motion
Dismiss
Wed 04/17 4:09 PM
MOTION to Dismiss Motion for Partial Dismissal by J.B. Hunt Transport Services, Inc..(Hamilton, Audra) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Charge of Discrimination | ||
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 04/17 4:06 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Audra K Hamilton, I on behalf of J.B. Hunt Transport Services, Inc.. (Hamilton, Audra) |
|
Monday, April 15, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Magistrate Notice/Consent Form
Mon 04/15 4:06 PM
Magistrate Notice/Consent Form furnished. (lgd) |
|
3 | 3
cmp
Complaint
Mon 04/15 3:56 PM
STATE COURT COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against J.B. Hunt Transport Services, Inc., filed by Ryan Waters.(lgd) |
|
Att: 1 State Court docket sheet | ||
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet
Mon 04/15 3:53 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET by J.B. Hunt Transport Services, Inc. (lgd) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Notice of Removal
Mon 04/15 3:51 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Washington County Circuit Court, case number 72CV-24-896., filed by J.B. Hunt Transport Services, Inc.(lgd) |
|
Att: 1 State Court complaint docs, | ||
Att: 2 state court docket sheet | ||
notice
Clerk's Notice Regarding Filing Fee
Mon 04/15 3:58 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE REGARDING FILING FEE. The following document was received and filed without the appropriate filing fee:1 Notice of Removal. You MUST pay the filing fee of $ 405.00 or file a motion to proceed In Forma Pauperis, if appropriate, within 2 business days. If the proper fees or motion are not received for case initiating documents, your case may be subject to dismissal. Present your payment to the appropriate Divisional Office or Pay Online, using the Civil -> Other Documents -> Filing Fee Submitted event. Filing Fee due by 4/17/2024 (lgd) |
||
notice
Clerk's Order re: Demand for Jury Trial
Mon 04/15 4:11 PM
TEXT ONLY CLERK'S ORDER requiring parties to request a trial by jury within 14 days from date of this order, if desired and allowed by law. (lgd) |
||
misc
Filing Fee Submitted
Mon 04/15 4:26 PM
Notice of Removal filing fee paid re1 Notice of Removal : $ 405, receipt number BARWDC-2961351.. (Hamilton, Audra) |