Frawner v. Federal Reserve Bank Of Richmond
Virginia Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | M Hannah Lauck |
Case #: | 3:24-cv-00275 |
Nature of Suit | 442 Civil Rights - Employment |
Cause | 42:2000 Job Discrimination (Religion) |
Case Filed: | Apr 15, 2024 |
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 16, 2024 1:23 AM EDT |
Defendant
Federal Reserve Bank Of Richmond
|
|
Plaintiff
Charles Edward Frawner
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 8 hours ago |
Tuesday, April 30, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
service
Summons Issued
Tue 04/30 10:10 AM
Summons Issued as to Federal Reserve Bank Of Richmond. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Please remove the headers and print two duplexed copies of the electronically issued summons for the Defendant. Please serve one copy of the summons and a copy of the Complaint upon the Defendant. Please ensure that your process server returns the service copy (executed or unexecuted) to your attention and electronically file it using the filing events, Summons Returned Executed or Summons Returned Unexecuted. (sbea) |
|
Monday, April 29, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Proposed Summons
Mon 04/29 4:33 PM
Proposed Summons REVISED by Charles E. Frawner, III. (Lloyd, Edward) |
|
4 | 4
1
pgs
order
Order
Mon 04/29 10:59 AM
ORDERThis matter comes before the Court sua sponte. Rule 7(E) of the Local Civil Rules for the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia shall not apply to this action. Any party desiring a hearing on a dispositive motion shall file a motion requesting a hearing when the motion is filed. The Court will determine whether a hearing is necessary. Signed by District Judge M. Hannah Lauck on 4/29/2024. (jsmi, ) |
|
Friday, April 19, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Notice of Correction
Fri 04/19 4:56 PM
Notice of Correction re2 Proposed Summons: Filing attorney notified to refile Proposed Summons for Federal Reserve Bank of Richmond as a non-fillable PDF with name of individual able to accept service. (jsmi, ) |
|
Tuesday, April 16, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
misc
Proposed Summons
Tue 04/16 4:57 PM
Proposed Summons by Charles E. Frawner, III.(Lloyd, Edward) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Summons, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Summons | ||
misc
Notice of Correction
Tue 04/16 11:42 AM
Filing attorney reminded to upload summons for service. (Kski, ) |
||
Monday, April 15, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 04/15 11:43 PM
Complaint ( Filing fee $ 405, receipt number AVAEDC-9473919.), filed by Charles Edward Frawner.(Lloyd, Edward) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
utility
Initial Case Assignment
Tue 04/16 11:32 AM
Initial Case Assignment to District Judge M. Hannah Lauck. (Kski, ) |