Brown v. United Healthcare Corporation
Arkansas Western District Court | |
Judge: | Susan O Hickey |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-01025 |
Nature of Suit | 791 Labor - Employee Retirement Income Security Act |
Cause | 28:1441 Petition for Removal |
Case Filed: | Apr 11, 2024 |
Case in other court: | Circuit Court of Ouachita County, 52CV-24-00044 Divisional Transfer from Case, 6:24-cv-06050-SOH |
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 16, 2024 9:10 PM CDT |
Defendant
United Healthcare Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Janice Brown
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 6 hours ago |
Friday, April 19, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File
Fri 04/19 11:03 AM
TEXT ONLY ORDER granting6 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Defendant's responsive pleading must be filed on or before 05/09/2024. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on April 19, 2024. (cha) |
|
Wednesday, April 17, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
motion
Extension of Time to File Document
Wed 04/17 11:35 AM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File to Plead by United Healthcare Corporation.(McKinney, Don) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, April 16, 2024 | ||
utility
Remark
Tue 04/16 9:08 AM
Remark: Pursuant to the Order filed 04/15/2024 in case 6:24-cv-06050-SOH, that case was transferred to the El Dorado Division of the Western District of Arkansas and assigned case number 24-1025 ALL documents must be filed in case 24-1025 (bjb) |
||
Monday, April 15, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
1
pgs
order
Order Transferring Case Out - Division
Mon 04/15 2:46 PM
ORDER Transferring Case from the Hot Springs division (6:24-cv-6050) to the El Dorado Division, Case No. 1:24-cv-1025. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on April 15, 2024. (jlm) Modified on 4/15/2024 to edit text (jlm). |
|
Friday, April 12, 2024 | ||
Notice of Removal filing fee paid re2 Notice of Removal : $ 405, receipt number AARWDC-2959883.. (McKinney, Don) | ||
Thursday, April 11, 2024 | ||
4 | 4 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form (jlm) (Main Document 4 replaced on 4/15/2024) (jlm). | |
3 | 3 STATE COURT COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against United Healthcare Corporation, filed by Janice Brown.(jlm) | |
2 | 2 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Ouachita, case number 52CV-24-44., filed by United Healthcare Corporation.(jlm) | |
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
1 | 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by United Healthcare Corporation. (jlm) | |
CLERK'S NOTICE REGARDING FILING FEE. The following document was received and filed without the appropriate filing fee:2 Notice of Removal. You MUST pay the filing fee of $405.00 or file a motion to proceed In Forma Pauperis, if appropriate, within 2 business days. If the proper fees or motion are not received for case initiating documents, your case may be subject to dismissal. Present your payment to the appropriate Divisional Office or Pay Online, using the Civil -> Other Documents -> Filing Fee Submitted event. Filing Fee due by 4/15/2024 (jlm) |