Gerrans v. Gunday et al
California Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Jacqueline Scott Corley |
Case #: | 3:24-cv-02187 |
Nature of Suit | 540 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Mandamus & Other |
Cause | 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Apr 12, 2024 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 04/30/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Monday, April 15, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
motion
Ex Parte Application PSP
Mon 04/15 2:19 PM
Ex Parte Application to Appoint the United States Marshal to Service Summons and Complaint re1 Complaint,3 Proposed Summons filed by Lawrence J. Gerrans. (kmg, COURT STAFF) |
|
utility
Remark
Mon 04/15 2:32 PM
Remark: Mailed by USPS In Forma Pauperis to Mr. Gerrans. (kmg, COURT STAFF) |
||
Friday, April 12, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
oth_evt
Clerk's Notice re: IFP
Mon 04/15 2:29 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE re completion of In Forma Pauperis affidavit or payment of filing fee due within 28 days. IFP Form due by 5/20/2024. (kmg, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Proposed Summons
Mon 04/15 2:11 PM
Proposed Summons. (kmg, COURT STAFF) |
|
2 | 2
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis PSP
Mon 04/15 2:07 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Lawrence J. Gerrans. (kmg, COURT STAFF) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 04/15 1:55 PM
COMPLAINT against Steve Bayern, Kevin Brown, Charles N. Wang PhD, Lon Chu, ES Medical LLC., Chistropher M. Gerrans, Whitney Gerrans, Erhan Gunday, Robin Harris, Alex Hsia, Jerry Katzman, Dennis Meyer, PHUC Main, Diana Ta. Filed by Lawrence J. Gerrans.(kmg, COURT STAFF) (kmg, COURT STAFF) |
|
Att: 1 Complaint Part 2, | ||
Att: 2 Letter, | ||
Att: 3 Envelope | ||
Att: 4 (4/15/2024) Exhibit, | ||
Att: 5 (4/15/2024) Exhibit Part 2 |