Tapler Lyons v. Meta Platforms, Inc. et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 4:22-md-03047
Lead case: 4:22-md-03047
California Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers |
Case #: | 4:24-cv-02214 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Apr 13, 2024 |
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 16, 2024 7:11 PM PDT |
Defendant
Facebook Operations, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Facebook Payments, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Instagram, LLC
1601 Willow Road
Menlo Park, CA 94025 |
|
Defendant
Meta Platforms, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Snap, Inc.
|
|
Plaintiff
Soraya Tapler Lyons
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/30/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Wednesday, April 17, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
service
Summons Issued
Wed 04/17 12:28 PM
Summons Issued as to Facebook Operations, LLC, Facebook Payments, Inc., Instagram, LLC, Meta Platforms, Inc., Siculus, Inc., Snap, Inc.. (dhm, COURT STAFF) |
|
Tuesday, April 16, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Proposed Summons
Tue 04/16 10:25 AM
Proposed Summons. (Rizkalla, Ruth) |
|
Monday, April 15, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
utility
~Util - Case Assigned by Intake
Mon 04/15 9:08 AM
Case assigned to Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (cv, COURT STAFF) |
|
utility
MDL Member Case
Mon 04/15 12:13 PM
MEMBER CASE OPENED MDL 3047: Tapler Lyons v. Meta Platforms, Inc. et al, Opened in California Northern District as 3:24-cv-02214-YGR. cc: JPMDL (dhm, COURT STAFF) |
||
utility
Electronic Filing Error
Mon 04/15 12:14 PM
[LINK:Electronic filing error] . Incorrect event used. [err101] ***Proposed Summons should not be submitted as an attachment to the complaint. This filing will not be processed by the clerks office. Please re-file in its entirety using the correct ECF event "Proposed Summons" Re:1 Complaint filed by Soraya Tapler Lyons (dhm, COURT STAFF) |
||
Saturday, April 13, 2024 | ||
1 | 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ACANDC-19317692.). Filed by Soraya Tapler Lyons.(Rizkalla, Ruth) | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Summons Proposed Summons |