Gomez v. Omnicell, Inc. et al
California Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Beth Labson Freeman |
Case #: | 5:24-cv-02205 |
Nature of Suit | 442 Civil Rights - Employment |
Cause | 28:1441 Petition for Removal |
Case Filed: | Apr 12, 2024 |
Case in other court: | County of Santa Clara Superior Court, 24CV432995 |
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 16, 2024 7:11 PM PDT |
Defendant
Johnson Service Group
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Omnicell, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Luis Gomez
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/30/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Tuesday, April 30, 2024 | ||
12 | 12
order
~Util - Case Assigned/Reassigned Order Reassigning Case
Tue 04/30 8:35 AM
Case Reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Judge Beth Labson Freeman and Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins for all further proceedings. Judge Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins no longer assigned to the case. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras., ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Beth Labson Freeman and Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins for all further proceedings. Judge Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins no longer assigned to case(smc, COURT STAFF) |
|
Att: 1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording | ||
Monday, April 29, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
oth_evt
Clerk's Notice of Impending Reassignment - Text Only
Mon 04/29 10:06 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND WILL BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (lmh, COURT STAFF) |
|
10 | 10
misc
Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge
Mon 04/29 2:53 PM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Johnson Service Group.. (Chang, Chloe) |
|
9 | 9
misc
Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge
Mon 04/29 1:59 PM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Luis Gomez.. (Shkodnik, Roman) |
|
8 | 8
notice
Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures
Mon 04/29 1:58 PM
Certificate of Interested Entities by Luis Gomez (Shkodnik, Roman) |
|
Monday, April 15, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
notice
Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures
Mon 04/15 5:33 PM
Certificate of Interested Entities by Omnicell, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent The Vanguard Group, Inc., Corporate Parent BlackRock, Inc. for Omnicell, Inc.. and Corporate Disclosure Statement (Cook, Collin) |
|
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 04/15 5:23 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Collin Dennis Cook for Defendant Omnicell, Inc. (Cook, Collin) |
|
5 | 5
order
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines
Mon 04/15 3:43 PM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: This case may fall within the Initial Discovery Protocols for Employment Cases Alleging Adverse Action. See [LINK:General Order 71] . Parties and Counsel are directed to review General Order 71 to determine whether it applies to this case, and to comply with that General Order if applicable. Case Management Statement due by 7/10/2024. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/17/2024 10:00 AM in San Jose, - Teleconference Only. (msr, COURT STAFF) |
|
4 | 4
utility
~Util - Case Assigned by Intake
Mon 04/15 10:39 AM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 4/29/2024. (kmg, COURT STAFF) |
|
respoth
Answer to Removal Complaint
Mon 04/15 3:55 PM
Answer to Removal Complaint by Johnson Service Group. (msr, COURT STAFF) |
||
Friday, April 12, 2024 | ||
3 | 3 NOTICE by Johnson Service Group re1 Notice of Removal, of Related Cases Pursuant to Local Rule 3-13 (Crosner, Ryan) | |
2 | 2 Certificate of Interested Entities by Johnson Service Group re1 Notice of Removal, (Crosner, Ryan) | |
1 | 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from County of Santa Clara Superior Court. Their case number is 24CV432995. (Filing fee $405 receipt number ACANDC-19317162). Filed by Johnson Service Group.(Crosner, Ryan) | |
Att: 1 Declaration of Ryan H. Crosner ISO, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A to Declaration of Ryan H. Crosner, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit B to Declaration of Ryan H. Crosner, | ||
Att: 4 Declaration of James E. Filarski ISO, | ||
Att: 5 Civil Cover Sheet |