10
|
|
10
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Tue 04/30 6:39 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Mario Palacios. Service waived by Built Brands LLC waiver sent on 4/24/2024, answer due 6/24/2024. (Weller, Charles)
Related: [-]
|
9
|
|
9
oth_evt
Clerk's Notice
Thu 04/18 3:03 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE: A Joint Case Management Statement due by 7/26/2024. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/2/2024 at 8:30 AM in San Francisco - To be determined. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ls, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
|
8
|
|
8
1
pgs
order
Order Reassigning Case ~Util - Case Assigned/Reassigned
Thu 04/18 11:15 AM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Charles R. Breyer for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by Clerk on 4/18/2024.(ark, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
|
| |
Att: 1
Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording
|
7
|
|
7
oth_evt
Clerk's Notice of Impending Reassignment - Text Only
Thu 04/18 7:43 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (klh, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
|
6
|
|
6
service
Summons Issued
Wed 04/17 9:11 AM
Summons Issued as to Built Brands LLC. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (dhm, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
|
5
|
|
5
misc
Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge
Wed 04/17 6:03 AM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Mario Palacios.. (Weller, Charles)
Related: [-]
|
4
|
|
4
misc
Proposed Summons
Wed 04/17 5:58 AM
Proposed Summons. (Weller, Charles)
Related: [-]
|
3
|
|
3
order
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines
Tue 04/16 3:58 PM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 7/12/2024. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/19/2024 02:00 PM in San Francisco, - To be held by Zoom. (dhm, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
|
2
|
|
2
utility
~Util - Case Assigned by Intake
Tue 04/16 9:22 AM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 4/30/2024. (cv, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
|
1
|
|
1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 04/16 8:28 AM
COMPLAINT against Built Brands LLC ( Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ACANDC-19322793.). Filed by Mario Palacios.(Weller, Charles)
Related: [-]
|
| |
Att: 1
Civil Cover Sheet
|