Squeo v. Campbell Soup Company
California Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Susan Van Keulen |
Case #: | 5:24-cv-02235 |
Nature of Suit | 370 Torts - Personal Property - Other Fraud |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Fraud |
Case Filed: | Apr 16, 2024 |
Case in other court: | Superior Court of Santa Clara, 24CV43263 |
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 16, 2024 10:11 AM PDT |
Defendant
Campbell Soup Company
|
|
Plaintiff
Joe Squeo
|
Docket last updated: 04/30/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Tuesday, April 23, 2024 | ||
12 | 12
misc
Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge
Tue 04/23 4:21 PM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Joe Squeo.. (Straub, Craig) |
|
Monday, April 22, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
service
Certificate/Proof of Service
Mon 04/22 11:57 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Campbell Soup Company re10 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines (Giali, Dale) |
|
Friday, April 19, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
order
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines
Fri 04/19 4:56 PM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 7/9/2024. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/16/2024 09:30 AM in San Jose, - Videoconference Only. (sec, COURT STAFF) |
|
Thursday, April 18, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
service
Certificate/Proof of Service
Thu 04/18 3:56 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Campbell Soup Company re 7 Case Assigned by Intake,, (Giali, Dale) |
|
8 | 8
3
pgs
order
Order
Thu 04/18 3:51 PM
Dkt. 4 Is Approved. Signed by Judge Susan van Keulen on April 18, 2024. (svklc2, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) |
|
7 | 7
utility
~Util - Case Assigned by Intake
Thu 04/18 2:34 PM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 5/2/2024. (as, COURT STAFF) |
|
Wednesday, April 17, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 04/17 1:14 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Rebecca Bari Johns (Johns, Rebecca) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 04/17 1:12 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Keri Elizabeth Borders (Borders, Keri) |
|
4 | 4
misc
Stipulation without Proposed Order
Wed 04/17 9:58 AM
STIPULATION re1 Notice of Removal, EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT filed by Campbell Soup Company.(Giali, Dale) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration of Dale J. Giali in Support of Stipulation Extending Time to Respond to Complaint | ||
Tuesday, April 16, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
service
Certificate/Proof of Service
Tue 04/16 5:03 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Campbell Soup Company re2 Certificate of Interested Entities,1 Notice of Removal, (Giali, Dale) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures
Tue 04/16 12:55 PM
Certificate of Interested Entities by Campbell Soup Company (Giali, Dale) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Notice of Removal
Tue 04/16 12:31 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL AND REMOVAL OF ACTION TO FEDERAL COURT from Superior Court of Santa Clara. Their case number is 24CV432063. (Filing fee $405 receipt number ACANDC-19324524). Filed by Campbell Soup Company.(Giali, Dale) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A to Notice of Removal (Complaint), | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B to Notice of Removal (Pleadings), | ||
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet |