Fraser v. Uber Technologies, Inc. et al
California Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Charles R Breyer |
Case #: | 3:24-cv-02237 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Apr 16, 2024 |
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 16, 2024 11:11 AM PDT |
Defendant
Rasier, LLC
1515 3rd Street
San Francisco, CA 94158 |
|
Defendant
Rasier-CA, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Uber Technologies, Inc.
1515 3rd St.
San Francisco, CA 94158 |
|
Plaintiff
Jordan Fraser
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/30/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Sunday, April 28, 2024 | ||
utility
MDL Member Case
Sun 04/28 10:04 AM
MEMBER CASE OPENED: Fraser v. Uber Technologies, Inc. et al, Opened in California Northern District as 3:24-cv-02237-CRB cc: JPMDL (far, COURT STAFF) |
||
Tuesday, April 23, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
service
Summons Returned Executed
Tue 04/23 1:39 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jordan Fraser. All Defendants. (Abrams, Rachel) |
|
5 | 5
service
Summons Issued
Tue 04/23 10:33 AM
Summons Issued as to Rasier, LLC, Rasier-CA, LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc. (gba, COURT STAFF) |
|
Tuesday, April 16, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
utility
~Util - Case Assigned by Intake
Thu 04/18 10:23 AM
Case assigned to Judge Charles R. Breyer. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (kmg, COURT STAFF) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Proposed Summons
Tue 04/16 10:18 AM
Proposed Summons. (Abrams, Rachel) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures
Tue 04/16 10:17 AM
Certificate of Interested Entities by Jordan Fraser (Abrams, Rachel) |
|
1 | 1
6
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Tue 04/16 10:17 AM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ACANDC-19323447.). Filed by Jordan Fraser.(Abrams, Rachel) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |