Dargin
Virginia Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Robert E Payne |
Case #: | 3:24-cv-00278 |
Nature of Suit | 442 Civil Rights - Employment |
Cause | 28:1331 Fed. Question: Employment Discrimination |
Case Filed: | Apr 16, 2024 |
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 16, 2024 3:12 PM EDT |
Defendant
Michael & Son Services, Inc.
|
|
Plaintiff
Chandell Dargin
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 6 hours ago |
Friday, April 19, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Pro hac vice
Fri 04/19 3:47 PM
ORDER granting3 Motion for Pro hac vice. Carla D. Aikens appointed for Chandell Dargin. Signed by District Judge Robert E. Payne on 4/19/2024. (jsmi, ) |
|
Wednesday, April 17, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
service
Summons Issued
Wed 04/17 12:07 PM
Summons Issued as to Michael & Son Services, Inc. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Please remove the headers and print two duplexed copies of the electronically issued summons for each Defendant. Please serve one copy of the summons and a copy of the Complaint upon each Defendant. Please ensure that your process server returns the service copy (executed or unexecuted) to your attention and electronically file it using the filing events, Summons Returned Executed or Summons Returned Unexecuted. (jsmi, ) |
|
3 | 3
motion
Pro Hac Vice
Wed 04/17 9:58 AM
Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Carla Dorsey Aikens and Certification of Local Counsel Craig Juraj Curwood Filing fee $ 75, receipt number AVAEDC-9477003. by Chandell Dargin. (Curwood, Craig) |
|
utility
Initial Case Assignment
Wed 04/17 12:05 PM
Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Robert E. Payne. (jsmi, ) |
||
Tuesday, April 16, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
misc
Proposed Summons
Tue 04/16 3:01 PM
Proposed Summons re1 Complaint by Chandell Dargin. (Curwood, Craig) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 04/16 3:00 PM
Complaint ( Filing fee $ 405, receipt number AVAEDC-9475623.), filed by Chandell Dargin.(Curwood, Craig) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |