New York Western District Court
Judge:Lawrence J Vilardo
Case #: 1:24-cv-00355
Nature of Suit863 Social Security - DIWC/DIWW (405(g))
Cause42:405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC)
Case Filed:Apr 16, 2024

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 04/27/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Tuesday, October 01, 2024
10 10 order Order Reassigning Case Tue 10/01 10:58 AM
TEXT ORDER reassigning this action to District Judge Hon. Lawrence J. Vilardo. Signed by Mary C. Loewenguth, Clerk of Court, on 10/1/2024. (CGJ)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 22, 2024
9 9 respm Reply/Response Thu 08/22 11:53 PM
REPLY/RESPONSE to re8 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings and in Response to Plaintiff's Motion Pursuant to L. Civ. R. 5.5 on Social Security Cases filed by Lisa Conner. (Laga-Sciandra, Kelly)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 08, 2024
8 8 motion Judgment on the Pleadings Thu 08/08 2:43 PM
MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings and in Response to Plaintiff's Motion Pursuant to L. Civ. R. 5.5 on Social Security Cases by Commissioner of Social Security.(Fitzhugh, Nicol)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support
Friday, July 26, 2024
7 7 notice Notice of Substitution of Counsel Fri 07/26 7:08 AM
Notice of Substitution of Counsel: Nicol Fitzhugh is substituted for Avni Gandhi. CLERK TO FOLLOW UP (Fitzhugh, Nicol)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 17, 2024
6 6 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 07/17 11:14 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Kelly Elizabeth Laga-Sciandra on behalf of Lisa Conner (Laga-Sciandra, Kelly)
Related: [-]
5 5 motion Judgment on the Pleadings Wed 07/17 11:13 PM
MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings by Lisa Conner.(Laga-Sciandra, Kelly)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support
Friday, June 21, 2024
4 4 notice Notice (Other) Fri 06/21 8:42 AM
NOTICE by Lisa Conner ATTORNEY FIRM NAME CHANGE/EMAIL UPDATE (Comerford, Ida)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 17, 2024
3 3 misc Transcript (Social Security) Mon 06/17 3:00 PM
TRANSCRIPT (Social Security) . (Gandhi, Avni)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 18, 2024
2 2 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 04/18 7:10 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Avni Dinesh Gandhi on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security (Gandhi, Avni)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 17, 2024
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Wed 04/17 1:07 PM
Case placed in Social Security Assignment Pool. (TMK)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge Wed 04/17 1:07 PM
Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at[LINK:http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms] . (TMK)
Related: [-]
service Social Security Appeal Notice re Service Wed 04/17 1:08 PM
NOTICE regarding service of1 Complaint, in a Social Security case: Commissioner of Social Security answer due 6/17/2024. Pursuant to Rule 3 of the Supplemental Rules for Social Security Actions under 42 U.S.C. 405(g), the Clerk issues this Notice of Electronic Filing to the Regional Social Security Administration's Office of General Counsel and the United States Attorney's Office for the Western District of New York. No summons will issue. (TMK)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 16, 2024
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 04/16 2:43 PM
COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security $ 405 receipt number ANYWDC-5157299, filed by Lisa Conner.(Comerford, Ida)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A-Notice of Decision-Unfavorable,
Att: 2 Exhibit B-Notice of Appeals Council,
Att: 3 Summons,
Att: 4 Summons,
Att: 5 Summons,
Att: 6 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 7 WITHDRAWAL OF CONSENT OF MAGRISTRATE