Walker v. Mettu
California Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Rita F Lin |
Referred: | Pslc Mbi |
Case #: | 3:24-cv-02252 |
Nature of Suit | 555 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Prison Condition |
Cause | 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Apr 16, 2024 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 04/30/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Tuesday, April 16, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
oth_sup
Exhibits
Tue 04/16 2:57 PM
EXHIBITS to Lodged Complaint re1 Clerk's Notice re: CDCR Email Filing Violation, filed by Jerry Lee Walker. (anj, COURT STAFF) (anj, COURT STAFF) |
|
Att: 1 (4/16/2024) Envelope | ||
1 | 1
oth_evt
Clerk's Notice re: CDCR Email Filing Violation
Tue 04/16 2:56 PM
CLERKS NOTICE: The filer failed to submit this S.1983 complaint through the email procedures required by General Order No. 76. If the filer does not, by the deadline below, either resubmit the documents through the email procedures or file a motion seeking permission to file the complaint by mail, this case will be dismissed without prejudice. Email resubmission deadline: 4/30/2024 (anj, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) |
|
Att: 1 Lodged Complaint, | ||
Att: 2 Lodged IFP |