Michael Gruen v. Joshua Richards et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Andre Birotte Jr |
Referred: | Stephanie S Christensen |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-01777 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract |
Case Filed: | Mar 05, 2024 |
Last checked: Sunday Sep 01, 2024 2:15 AM PDT |
Defendant
Buddys Hard LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Crosscheck Studios LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Does
|
|
Defendant
Joshua Richards
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Christopher Sawtelle
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Michael Gruen
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
CAA Holdings, LLC
Terminated: 06/04/2024
|
|
Defendant
Creative Artists Agency, LLC
Terminated: 06/04/2024
|
Docket last updated: 09/08/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Friday, August 30, 2024 | ||
79 | 79
minutes
Motion Hearing Dismiss Strike Sanctions
Tue 09/03 11:19 AM
MINUTES OF Motion Hearing held before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. RE: Defendants Joshua Richards, Christopher Sawtelle, Buddy's Hard, LLC and Crosscheck Studios, LLC's Motion to Dismiss36 ; Defendants Joshua Richards, Christopher Sawtelle, Crosscheck Studios, LLC and Buddy's Hard, LLC's Anti-SLAPP Motion to First Amended Complaint37 ; Defendants Joshua Richards, Christopher Sawtelle, Buddy's Hard, LLC and Crosscheck Studios, LLC's Motion for Sanctions Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. Rule 1160 ; Plaintiff Michael Gruen's Motion for Sanctions Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 1162 . For the reasons stated on the record, the Court orders docket entries55 ,56 ,62 , and78 be STRICKEN. The Court and Counsel confer, Motions60 and62 are WITHDRAWN by counsel. The Court having carefully considered the papers and the evidence submitted by the parties, and having heard the oral argument of counsel, hereby takes the motions36 and37 under submission. Court Reporter: Laura Elias. (gk) |
|
Wednesday, August 28, 2024 | ||
78 | 78
misc
Status Report
Wed 08/28 3:41 PM
STATUS REPORT filed by Plaintiff Michael Gruen.(Moran, William) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Gruen Declaration |