Virginia Eastern District Court
Case #: 4:24-cr-00029
Case Filed:Apr 15, 2024
Terminated:Apr 15, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 17, 2024 3:21 AM EDT
Plaintiff
USA
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
David Wayne Nelson (1)
Terminated: 04/15/2024


Docket last updated: 04/17/2024 4:06 AM EDT
Monday, April 15, 2024
1 1 TRANSFER OF JURISDICTION for Supervision of Releasee David Wayne Nelson. Downloaded copies of indictment, judgment and docket sheet via PACER from District of Maryland Baltimore.(mrees)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Indictment,
Att: 2 Judgment,
Att: 3 Docket Sheet