Jordan v. O'Malley
California Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Robert M Illman |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-02219 |
Nature of Suit | 863 Social Security - DIWC/DIWW (405(g)) |
Cause | 42:1383 Review of HHS Decision |
Case Filed: | Apr 15, 2024 |
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 17, 2024 8:05 PM PDT |
Defendant
Martin O'Malley
|
|
Interested Party
SSA (INTERESTED PARTY / NEF)
Woodlawn, MD 21235
|
|
Plaintiff
Brandy J. Jordan
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/30/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Monday, April 29, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge
Mon 04/29 9:07 AM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Martin O'Malley.. (Highland, Erin) |
|
Thursday, April 25, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge
Thu 04/25 2:34 PM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Brandy J. Jordan.. (Sackett, Harvey) |
|
Wednesday, April 17, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Wed 04/17 8:16 AM
Order by Magistrate Judge Robert M. Illman granting 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (rmilc1, COURT STAFF) |
|
Tuesday, April 16, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
order
Social Security Procedural Order
Tue 04/16 11:38 AM
SOCIAL SECURITY PROCEDURAL ORDER. (mcl, COURT STAFF) |
|
3 | 3
utility
~Util - Case Assigned by Intake
Tue 04/16 10:00 AM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Robert M. Illman. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 4/30/2024. (kmg, COURT STAFF) |
|
Monday, April 15, 2024 | ||
2 | 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Brandy J. Jordan. (Sackett, Harvey) | |
1 | 1 COMPLAINT For Judicial Review of Decision of Commissioner of Social Security against Martin O'Malley. Filed by Brandy J. Jordan.(Sackett, Harvey) | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |