6
|
|
6
oth_evt
Clerk's Notice re: Consent or Declination
Thu 04/25 2:35 PM
SECOND CLERK'S NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff has filed a request for Mandatory Temporary Injunction. Plaintiff shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at:[LINK:http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms] . (Party/parties were also notified via telephone or email.) Consent/Declination due by 5/3/2024. (ig, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
|
5
|
|
5
oth_evt
Clerk's Notice re: Consent or Declination
Wed 04/17 3:16 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at:[LINK:http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms] . Consent/Declination due by 4/24/2024. (ig, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
|
4
|
|
4
order
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines
Tue 04/16 12:54 PM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 7/10/2024. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/17/2024 01:30 PM in Oakland, - Videoconference Only. (mcl, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
|
3
|
|
3
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Tue 04/16 12:52 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Lizbeth Peralta. (mcl, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
|
2
|
|
2
misc
Request
Tue 04/16 12:51 PM
REQUEST for immediate mandatory temporary injunction by Lizbeth Peralta. (mcl, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
|
1
|
|
1
6
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Tue 04/16 12:47 PM
COMPLAINT against T-Mobile. Filed by Lizbeth Peralta. Consent/Declination due by 4/29/2024.(mcl, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
|
| |
Att: 1
Civil Cover Sheet
|