American Conservative Union et al v. Reese
Virginia Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Rossie D Alston, Jr |
Referred: | Lindsey R Vaala |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-00629 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Contract Dispute |
Case Filed: | Apr 17, 2024 |
Case in other court: | Circuit Court for the City of Alexandria, Virginia, CL24001391 |
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 17, 2024 8:07 AM EDT |
Defendant
Zoe Reese
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
American Conservative Union
|
|
Plaintiff
American Conservative Union Foundation
|
Docket last updated: 87 minutes ago |
Monday, April 22, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Notice of Hearing Date
Mon 04/22 11:51 AM
Notice of Hearing Date set for 06/05/2024 re5 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Hyland, Timothy) |
|
6 | 6
18
pgs
respm
Memorandum in Support
Mon 04/22 11:50 AM
Memorandum in Support re5 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Zoe Reese. (Hyland, Timothy) |
|
5 | 5
motion
Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim
Mon 04/22 11:49 AM
MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Zoe Reese. (Hyland, Timothy) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 04/22 11:28 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Jamie Michelle Hertz on behalf of Zoe Reese (Hertz, Jamie) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Notice (other)
Mon 04/22 7:30 AM
NOTICE by Zoe Reese re1 Notice of Removal - Supplemental State Court Documents(Hyland, Timothy) |
|
Att: 1 Supplement State Court Documents (Legible) | ||
utility
Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings
Mon 04/22 3:36 PM
Set Deadline as to5 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Motion Hearing set for 6/5/2024 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 1000 before District Judge Rossie D. Alston Jr.. (triver) |
||
Wednesday, April 17, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
notice
Notice (other)
Wed 04/17 7:16 AM
NOTICE by Zoe Reese of Related Case (Hyland, Timothy) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Notice of Removal
Wed 04/17 7:06 AM
Notice of Removal ( Filing fee $ 405, receipt number AVAEDC-9476551.), filed by Zoe Reese.(Hyland, Timothy) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
utility
Initial Case Assignment
Wed 04/17 2:59 PM
Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Rossie D. Alston, Jr and Magistrate Judge Lindsey R. Vaala. (Cwel) |
||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Thu 04/18 7:25 AM
Case Reassigned to District Judge Rossie D. Alston, Jr. District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema no longer assigned to the case. (wgar, ) |