Florida Southern District Court
Judge:Darrin P Gayles
Referred: Jonathan Goodman
Case #: 1:24-cv-21431
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Apr 17, 2024
Terminated:Mar 25, 2025
Last checked: Monday Oct 14, 2024 4:22 AM EDT
Defendant
Oragenics, Inc.
1990 MainSt Ste.750
Sarasota, FL 34236
Represented By
Jarrod J. Malone
Shumaker, Loop & Kendrick, LLP
contact info
Justin Patrick Senior
Shumaker, Loop & Kendrick, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Ladenburg Thalmann & Co. Inc.
Represented By
Mark J. Astarita
Sallah Astarita & Cox, LLC
contact info
Patrick Joseph Rengstl
Patrick J. Rengstl, P.A.
contact info
James D. Sallah
Sallah Astarita & Cox, LLC
contact info

GPO May 03 2024
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS on 7 Plaintiff's MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunctive Relief. Objections to R&R due by 5/17/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman on 5/3/2024. See attached document for full details. (mkr)
GPO Jun 11 2024
ORDER adopting 26 Report and Recommendation and denying 7 Plaintiff's Verified Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunctive Relief. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles See attached document for full details. (hs01)

Docket last updated: 71 minutes ago
Tuesday, March 25, 2025
39 39 order Order Dismissing/Closing Case or Party Tue 03/25 9:22 AM
PAPERLESS ORDER dismissing action without prejudice pursuant to38 the parties' Stipulation for Dismissal Without Prejudice. Defendant's Motion to Dismiss or in the Alternative Stay and Compel Arbitration27 is denied as moot. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles on 3/25/2025. (hs01)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 24, 2025
38 38 misc Stipulation of Dismissal - aty Mon 03/24 5:36 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice by Ladenburg Thalmann & Co. Inc. Related [+]
Related: [-] ngstl, Patrick
Thursday, March 20, 2025
37 37 order Order Setting Hearing on Motion Thu 03/20 2:30 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER Setting Hearing on27 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss or in the Alternative Stay and Compel Arbitration for March 28, 2025, at 10:00 a.m. in the Miami Division before Judge Darrin P. Gayles at the Wilkie D. Ferguson Jr. U.S. Courthouse, 400 North Miami Avenue, Courtroom 11-1, Miami, Florida. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles on 3/20/2025. (hs01)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 24, 2024
36 36 respm Reply to Response to Motion Mon 06/24 11:17 AM
REPLY to Response to Motion re27 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction1 Complaint or in the Alternative Stay and Compel Arbitration filed by Oragenics, Inc..(Malone, Jarrod)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 Investment Banking Agmt
Tuesday, June 18, 2024
35 35 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Tue 06/18 5:24 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re27 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction1 Complaint or in the Alternative Stay and Compel Arbitration filed by Ladenburg Thalmann & Co. Inc.. Replies due by 6/25/2024. Related [+]
Related: [-] ngstl, Patrick
Tuesday, June 11, 2024
34 34 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer Tue 06/11 5:19 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER granting in part29 Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss or in the Alternative Stay and Compel Arbitration. By June 18, 3024, Plaintiff shall respond to27 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss or in the Alternative Stay and Compel Arbitration. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles (hs01)
Related: [-]
33 33 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Temporary Restraining Order Order on Report and Recommendations Tue 06/11 5:17 PM
ORDER adopting26 Report and Recommendation and denying7 Plaintiff's Verified Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunctive Relief. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles See attached document for full details. (hs01)
Related: [-]
utility ~Util - Set/Reset Motion/R&R Deadlines and Hearings Wed 06/12 8:01 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings as to27 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction1 Complaint or in the Alternative Stay and Compel Arbitration . (per order de#29) Responses due by 6/18/2024. (drz)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 30, 2024
32 32 respoth Response to Objection to Report and Recommendations Thu 05/30 3:00 PM
RESPONSE TO OBJECTION to26 Report and Recommendations by Oragenics, Inc.. (Malone, Jarrod)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 23, 2024
31 31 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Thu 05/23 3:26 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re29 Plaintiff's MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to27 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction1 Complaint or in the Alternative Stay and Compel Arbitration filed by Oragenics, Inc.. Replies due by 5/30/2024.(Malone, Jarrod)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order A - proposed order
30 30 order - Order (PAPERLESS or pdf attached) Thu 05/23 6:49 AM
PAPERLESS ORDER. On or before Friday, May 24, 2024, Defendant shall file a response to29 Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss or in the Alternative Stay and Compel Arbitration. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles (hs01)
Related: [-]
utility ~Util - Set/Reset Motion/R&R Deadlines and Hearings Thu 05/23 8:28 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings as to27 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction1 Complaint or in the Alternative Stay and Compel Arbitration . (per order de#30) Responses due by 5/24/2024. (drz)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 21, 2024
29 29 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer Tue 05/21 1:26 PM
Plaintiff's MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to27 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction1 Complaint or in the Alternative Stay and Compel Arbitration by Ladenburg Thalmann & Co. Inc.. Related [+]
Related: [-] ngstl, Patrick
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Exhibit A (Proposed Order)
Friday, May 17, 2024
28 28 respoth Objections to Report and Recommendations Fri 05/17 4:44 PM
OBJECTIONS to26 Report and Recommendations by Ladenburg Thalmann & Co. Inc.. Related [+]
Related: [-] ngstl, Patrick
Thursday, May 09, 2024
27 27 motion Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction Thu 05/09 4:20 PM
Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction1 Complaint or in the Alternative Stay and Compel Arbitration by Oragenics, Inc.. Responses due by 5/23/2024.(Malone, Jarrod)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Investment Banking Agreement,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - FINRA letter dtd 3-12-24,
Att: 3 Exhibit C - FINRA Rule 12512,
Att: 4 Exhibit D - FINRA Rule 12513,
Att: 5 Exhibit E - proposed Order
Friday, May 03, 2024
26 26 motion Report and Recommendations Fri 05/03 2:01 PM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS on7 Plaintiff's MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunctive Relief. Objections to R&R due by 5/17/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman on 5/3/2024. See attached document for full details. (mkr)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 30, 2024
25 25 notice Notice of Supplemental Authority Tue 04/30 4:46 PM
Notice of Supplemental Authority by Ladenburg Thalmann & Co. Inc. Related [+]
Related: [-] ngstl, Patrick
Att: 1 20 pgs Exhibit A (Cited Authority/Case Law)
24 24 notice Notice (Other) Tue 04/30 4:28 PM
Plaintiff's NOTICE OF FILING DECLARATION OF NICHOLAS STERGIS by Ladenburg Thalmann & Co. Inc. Related [+]
Related: [-] ngstl, Patrick
Att: 1 125 pgs Affidavit Declaration of Nicholas Stergis
23 23 notice Notice of Supplemental Authority Tue 04/30 4:11 PM
Notice of Supplemental Authority re19 Response in Opposition to Motion,,21 Order by Oragenics, Inc. (Malone, Jarrod)
Related: [-]
22 22 misc Affidavit Tue 04/30 4:09 PM
AFFIDAVIT DECLARATION signed by: Mark A. Catchur, Esq. re21 Order,19 Response in Opposition to Motion,, by Oragenics, Inc.(Malone, Jarrod)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - 11/28/22 redline,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - 12/2/22 redline
Friday, April 26, 2024
21 21 order - Order (PAPERLESS or pdf attached) Fri 04/26 2:10 PM
POST-HEARING ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman on 4/26/2024. See attached document for full details. (mkr)
Related: [-]
20 20 minutes MOTION Hearing or Evidentiary Motion Hearing Fri 04/26 11:16 AM
PAPERLESS Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman: Motion Hearing held on 4/26/2024 re7 Plaintiff's MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunctive Relief. Post-Hearing Administrative Order to follow. Total time in court: 1 hour(s) : 42 minutes. Attorney Appearance(s): Mark J. Astarita, Patrick Joseph Rengstl, Justin Patrick Senior, (Digital JG-09:26:47) (fbn)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 24, 2024
19 19 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Wed 04/24 4:48 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re7 Plaintiff's MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunctive Relief filed by Oragenics, Inc.. Replies due by 5/1/2024.(Malone, Jarrod)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 29 pgs Exhibit A - Oragenics Statement of Claim,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - FINRA service letter,
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Ladenburg CRD,
Att: 4 Exhibit D - Investment Banking Agreement,
Att: 5 Exhibit E - 5-15-23 addendum,
Att: 6 Exhibit F - 7-14-23 addendum,
Att: 7 Exhibit G - FINRA Rule 12200,
Att: 8 Exhibit H - Regulatory Notice 16-25,
Att: 9 76 pgs Exhibit I - Oragenics 4-19-24 letter to FINRA,
Att: 10 3 pgs Exhibit J - proposed Order
18 18 notice Notice (Other) Wed 04/24 12:09 PM
Joint NOTICE RE: SOLELY ARGUMENT OF COUNSEL FOR HEARING ON APRIL 26, 2024 by Ladenburg Thalmann & Co. Inc. Related [+]
Related: [-] ngstl, Patrick
Tuesday, April 23, 2024
17 17 order Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages Tue 04/23 1:55 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER granting15 Defendant's Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages. Defendant is granted leave to file a response memorandum to7 Plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunctive Relief not to exceed 24-pages in length. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman on 4/23/2024. (mkr)
Related: [-]
16 16 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Tue 04/23 1:45 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jarrod J. Malone on behalf of Oragenics, Inc.. Attorney Jarrod J. Malone added to party Oragenics, Inc.(pty:dft). (Malone, Jarrod)
Related: [-]
15 15 motion File Excess Pages Tue 04/23 1:42 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Oragenics, Inc..(Senior, Justin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
14 14 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Tue 04/23 1:03 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Justin Patrick Senior on behalf of Oragenics, Inc.. Attorney Justin Patrick Senior added to party Oragenics, Inc.(pty:dft). (Senior, Justin)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 22, 2024
13 13 notice Notice (Other) Mon 04/22 12:32 PM
Plaintiff's NOTICE OF FILING SUPPLEMENTAL CERTIFICATION OF MARK J. ASTARITA, ESQ. by Ladenburg Thalmann & Co. Inc. Related [+]
Related: [-] ngstl, Patrick
Att: 1 Exhibit A (Supplemental Certification)
Friday, April 19, 2024
12 12 notice Notice (Other) Fri 04/19 4:15 PM
Plaintiff's NOTICE OF FILING DEFENDANT'S EMERGENCY LETTER REQUEST TO FINRA DATED APRIL 19, 2024 by Ladenburg Thalmann & Co. Inc. Related [+]
Related: [-] ngstl, Patrick
Att: 1 Exhibit A (Defendant's Emergency Letter Request to FINRA)
11 11 notice Notice of Compliance Fri 04/19 3:01 PM
NOTICE of Compliance by Ladenburg Thalmann & Co. Inc. re10 Order Setting Hearing on Motion, Related [+]
Related: [-] ngstl, Patrick
Att: 1 Exhibit A (Affidavit of Service)
Thursday, April 18, 2024
10 10 2 pgs order Order Setting Hearing on Motion Thu 04/18 11:59 AM
ORDER Setting In-Person Hearing on Motion7 Plaintiff's MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunctive Relief : Motion Hearing set for 4/26/2024 09:30 AM in Miami Division before Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman on 4/18/2024. See attached document for full details. (mkr)
Related: [-]
9 9 order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 04/18 10:10 AM
PAPERLESS ORDER granting6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Mark J. Astarita is permitted to appear before this Court on behalf of Plaintiff Ladenburg Thalmann & Co. Inc. in the above-styled case. The Clerk shall provide electronic notification of all electronic filings to Mr. Astarita at mja@sallahlaw.com. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles (hs01)
Related: [-]
8 8 order Order Referring Motion Thu 04/18 9:44 AM
PAPERLESS ORDER REFERRING7 Plaintiff's Verified Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunctive Relief to Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles (hs01)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 17, 2024
7 7 motion Temporary Restraining Order Wed 04/17 5:16 PM
Plaintiff's MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunctive Relief by Ladenburg Thalmann & Co. Inc.. Responses due by 5/1/2024. Related [+]
Related: [-] ngstl, Patrick
Att: 1 Exhibit A (FINRA Statement of Claim),
Att: 2 Exhibit B (Investment Banking Agreement),
Att: 3 Exhibit C (Proposed TRO)
6 6 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice - aty Wed 04/17 2:11 PM
Plaintiff's MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Mark J. Astarita. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-17455635 by Ladenburg Thalmann & Co. Inc.. Responses due by 5/1/2024.(Sallah, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A (Certification),
Att: 2 Exhibit B (Proposed Order)
5 5 order Notice of Court Practice/to Appear/Other Wed 04/17 1:07 PM
NOTICE OF COURT PRACTICE. Unless otherwise specified by the Court, every motion shall be double-spaced in Times New Roman 12-point typeface. Multiple Plaintiffs or Defendants shall file joint motions with co-parties unless there are clear conflicts of position. If conflicts of position exist, parties shall explain the conflicts in their separate motions. Failure to comply with ANY of these procedures may result in the imposition of appropriate sanctions, including but not limited to, the striking of the motion or dismissal of this action. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles (hs01)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Wed 04/17 12:55 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Patrick Joseph Rengstl on behalf of Ladenburg Thalmann & Co. Inc. Related [+]
Related: [-] ngstl, Patrick
3 3 1 pgs service Summons Issued Wed 04/17 12:37 PM
Summons Issued as to Oragenics, Inc. (nwn)
Related: [-]
2 2 order Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent Wed 04/17 12:36 PM
Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Darrin P. Gayles. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (nwn)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 04/17 10:50 AM
COMPLAINT against Oragenics, Inc.. Filing fees $ 405.00 receipt number AFLSDC-17454643, filed by Ladenburg Thalmann & Co. Inc..(Sallah, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 11 pgs Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 2 pgs Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 4 2 pgs Summon(s)