Garrison v. In the matter of the Complaint of DENNIS K. GARRISON, as the owner of the 1989 Sea Ray 340 Sundancer Little Buddy, for Exoneration from, or Limitation of, Liability
California Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers |
Case #: | 4:24-cv-02282 |
Nature of Suit | 340 Torts - Personal Injury - Marine |
Cause | 28:1333 Admiralty |
Case Filed: | Apr 17, 2024 |
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 17, 2024 12:12 PM PDT |
In Re
Dennis K. Garrison
|
Represented By
|
In Re
In the matter of the Complaint of DENNIS K. GARRISON, as the owner of the 1989 Sea Ray 340 Sundancer Little Buddy, for Exoneration from, or Limitation of, Liability
|
Docket last updated: 04/30/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Monday, April 29, 2024 | ||
13 | 13
oth_evt
Clerk's Notice ~Util - Teleconference Zoom
Mon 04/29 10:02 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. You are hereby notified that the Initial Case Management Conference will be held by Zoom Webinar. Joint Case Management Statement is due by 7/22/2024. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/29/2024 at 02:00 PM in Oakland, - Videoconference Only. Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at [LINK:https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/ygr] Court Appearances: Advanced notice is required of counsel or parties who wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. A list of names and emails must be sent to the CRD at ygrcrd@cand.uscourts.gov no later than July 26, 2024, at 12:00 PM PST. General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. Zoom Guidance and Setup: [LINK:https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/] . (eac, COURT STAFF) |
|
Thursday, April 25, 2024 | ||
12 | 12
1
pgs
order
Order Reassigning Case ~Util - Case Assigned/Reassigned
Thu 04/25 11:21 AM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu no longer assigned to case. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by The Clerk on 4/25/2024.(wsm, COURT STAFF) |
|
Att: 1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording | ||
Wednesday, April 24, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
oth_evt
Clerk's Notice of Impending Reassignment - Text Only
Wed 04/24 10:22 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (ig, COURT STAFF) |
|
Tuesday, April 23, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge
Tue 04/23 11:18 AM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Dennis K. Garrison.. (Lerner, Neil) |
|
Monday, April 22, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
oth_evt
Clerk's Notice re: Consent or Declination
Mon 04/22 1:04 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE TO Plaintiff Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at:[LINK:http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms] . Consent/Declination due by 4/29/2024. (ig, COURT STAFF) |
|
Thursday, April 18, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
order
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines
Thu 04/18 2:03 PM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 7/10/2024. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/17/2024, 01:30 PM in Oakland - via Zoom. (kmm2, COURT STAFF) |
|
7 | 7
notice
Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures
Thu 04/18 12:51 PM
Certificate of Interested Entities by Dennis K. Garrison identifying Other Affiliates Progressive Insurance, Lisa Owings, Paul Von Wiedenfield, Mary Abbott, Owl Harbor Marina for Dennis K. Garrison. (Lerner, Neil) Modified on 4/18/2024 (kmm2, COURT STAFF) |
|
6 | 6
utility
~Util - Case Assigned by Intake
Thu 04/18 9:58 AM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 5/2/2024. (wsm, COURT STAFF) |
|
utility
Electronic Filing Error
Thu 04/18 12:34 PM
[LINK:Electronic filing error] . INTERESTED ENTITIES - NAMES NOT ENTERED: Names of interested entities or persons MUST be entered at the prompt when filing. [err102] Please re-file in its entirety. Re:3 Certificate of Interested Entities filed by Dennis K. Garrison (kmm2, COURT STAFF) |
||
Wednesday, April 17, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Stipulation without Proposed Order
Wed 04/17 12:30 PM
STIPULATION for Value filed by Dennis K. Garrison.(Lerner, Neil) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A., Affidavit | ||
4 | 4
notice
Notice (Other)
Wed 04/17 12:26 PM
NOTICE by Dennis K. Garrison of lodging(Lerner, Neil) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, Proposed Order Directing Monition to Issue and Restraining All Suits, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B, Proposed Order Directing Execution of Monition and Publication Of Notice, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C, Proposed Order Approving Stipulation for Value | ||
3 | 3
notice
Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures
Wed 04/17 12:16 PM
Certificate of Interested Entities by Dennis K. Garrison (Lerner, Neil) |
|
2 | 2
motion
Ex Parte Application
Wed 04/17 12:05 PM
Ex Parte Application 1.Proposed Order Directing Monition to Issue and Restraining All Suits; 2.Proposed Order Directing Execution of Monition and Publication of Notice; 3.Proposed Order Approving Stipulation for Value filed by Dennis K. Garrison. (Lerner, Neil) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 04/17 11:57 AM
COMPLAINT in Admiralty against In the matter of the Complaint of DENNIS K. GARRISON, as the owner of the 1989 Sea Ray 340 Sundancer Little Buddy, for Exoneration from, or Limitation of, Liability ( Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ACANDC-19328203.). Filed by Dennis K. Garrison.(Lerner, Neil) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
utility
Electronic Filing Error
Wed 04/17 4:34 PM
[LINK:Electronic filing error] . NATURE OF SUIT SELECTED DOES NOT MATCH WHAT IS ON THE CIVIL COVER SHEET; 890 OTHER STATUTORY ACTIONS IS SELECTED; HOWEVER, NATURE OF SUIT ENTERED IN ECF IS 340. Please e-file an Amended Civil Cover Sheet only Re:1 Complaint, filed by Dennis K. Garrison (wsm, COURT STAFF) |