Conkwright v. Forefront Dermatology, S.C. et al
Virginia Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Mark S Davis |
Referred: | Lawrence R Leonard |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-00249 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Injunctive & Declaratory Relief |
Case Filed: | Apr 17, 2024 |
Case in other court: | Virginia Beach Circuit Court, CL24001097-00 |
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 17, 2024 4:11 PM EDT |
Defendant
Forefront Dermatology, S.C.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Forefront Management, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Caroline Conkwright
|
Docket last updated: 2 hours ago |
Monday, April 22, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
respoth
Brief in Support
Mon 04/22 5:14 PM
Brief in Support to7 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Caroline Conkwright. (Martingayle, Kevin) |
|
7 | 7
motion
Remand to State Court
Mon 04/22 5:12 PM
MOTION to Remand to State Court by Caroline Conkwright.(Martingayle, Kevin) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Mon 04/22 3:11 PM
ORDER granting5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Plaintiff's Complaint re All Defendants, since the Court has been advised that Plaintiff does not intend to file an opposition to Defendants' motion. Responsive pleadings will now be due on or before May 8, 2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence R. Leonard on 4/22/2024. (Leonard, Lawrence) |
||
Friday, April 19, 2024 | ||
utility
Motions Referred
Fri 04/19 11:33 AM
MOTIONS REFERRED to Magistrate Judge: Leonard.5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint (mrees) |
||
Thursday, April 18, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Thu 04/18 5:32 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint by Forefront Dermatology, S.C., Forefront Management, LLC. (Hitchcock, Courtney) |
|
Wednesday, April 17, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
utility
Mag Notice / Judge Information
Wed 04/17 4:50 PM
Magistrate Judge Notice and Judge's Information to counsel. (epri, ) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Citizenship Disclosure Form
Wed 04/17 4:10 PM
Citizenship Disclosure Form (Local Rule 7.1) by Forefront Dermatology, S.C., Forefront Management, LLC. (Hitchcock, Courtney) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Financial Disclosure Statement
Wed 04/17 4:08 PM
Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Forefront Dermatology, S.C., Forefront Management, LLC. (Hitchcock, Courtney) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Notice of Removal
Wed 04/17 4:01 PM
Notice of Removal ( Filing fee $ 405, receipt number AVAEDC-9478287.), filed by Forefront Management, LLC, Forefront Dermatology, S.C..(Hitchcock, Courtney) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - State Court Pleadings, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, | ||
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
utility
Initial Case Assignment
Wed 04/17 4:49 PM
Initial Case Assignment to Chief District Judge Mark S. Davis and Magistrate Judge Lawrence R. Leonard. (epri, ) |