Chesapeake Bank v. Jones et al
Virginia Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | John A Gibney, Jr |
Case #: | 3:24-cv-00283 |
Nature of Suit | 890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Interpleader Action |
Case Filed: | Apr 17, 2024 |
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 17, 2024 6:15 PM EDT |
Defendant
Stella Gale Jones
|
|
Defendant
Perfect Touch Innovations, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Valley Communities Credit Union
|
|
Plaintiff
Chesapeake Bank
|
Docket last updated: 1 hours ago |
Monday, April 29, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
service
Summons Returned Executed
Mon 04/29 11:55 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Chesapeake Bank Stella Gale Jones served on 4/25/2024, answer due 5/16/2024 (Boyd, John) |
|
Tuesday, April 23, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Tue 04/23 10:05 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Chesapeake Bank. Valley Communities Credit Union waiver sent on 4/18/2024, answer due 6/17/2024. (Boyd, John) |
|
Thursday, April 18, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
service
Summons Issued
Thu 04/18 2:27 PM
Summons Issued as to Stella Gale Jones, Perfect Touch Innovations, LLC, and Valley Communities Credit Union. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Please remove the headers and print two duplexed copies of the electronically issued summons for each Defendant. Please serve one copy of the summons and a copy of the Complaint upon the Defendant. Please ensure that your process server returns the service copy (executed or unexecuted) to your attention and electronically file it using the filing events, Summons Returned Executed or Summons Returned Unexecuted . (sbea) |
|
6 | 6
4
pgs
respm
Memorandum in Support
Thu 04/18 10:23 AM
Memorandum in Support re5 MOTION for Interpleader Deposit (28 U.S.C. Section 1335) filed by Chesapeake Bank.(Boyd, John) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
5 | 5
motion
Deposit Interpleader Funds (28 U.S.C. Section 1335)
Thu 04/18 10:22 AM
MOTION for Interpleader Deposit (28 U.S.C. Section 1335) by Chesapeake Bank. (Boyd, John) |
|
4 | 4
misc
Proposed Summons
Thu 04/18 8:58 AM
Proposed Summons re2 Complaint Valley Communities Credit Union by Chesapeake Bank. (Boyd, John) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Financial Disclosure Statement
Thu 04/18 8:55 AM
Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Chesapeake Bank. (Boyd, John) |
|
2 | 2
cmp
Complaint
Thu 04/18 8:53 AM
Complaint for Interpleader (Filing Fee: $405, Receipt Number: AVAEDC-9478720), filed by Chesapeake Bank. (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Boyd, John). (Clerk replaced Complaint to include Civil Action Number on 4/18/2024). Modified on 4/18/2024. (sbea) |
|
misc
Notice of Correction
Thu 04/18 2:15 PM
Notice of Correction re:1 Proposed Summons and4 Proposed Summons; Valley Communities Credit Union was submitted twice. Service address appears to be the same on both submitted Summons'. (sbea) |
||
Wednesday, April 17, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
misc
Proposed Summons
Wed 04/17 5:32 PM
Proposed Summons by Chesapeake Bank.(Boyd, John) |
|
Att: 1 Jones, | ||
Att: 2 Perfect Touch Innovation, LLC | ||
utility
Initial Case Assignment
Thu 04/18 2:13 PM
Initial Case Assignment to District Judge John A. Gibney, Jr. (sbea) |