Ketcher v. White et al
Arkansas Western District Court | |
Judge: | Timothy L Brooks |
Referred: | Mark E Ford |
Case #: | 5:24-cv-05090 |
Nature of Suit | 550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Apr 17, 2024 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 04/29/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Monday, April 29, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis (42:1983)
Mon 04/29 3:35 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (42:1983) by Jarrod Ketcher. Motions referred to Mark E. Ford.(lgd) |
|
6 | 6
cmp
Amended Complaint
Mon 04/29 3:33 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Venasula, White, filed by Jarrod Ketcher.(lgd) |
|
Wednesday, April 17, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Magistrate Notice/Consent Form
Wed 04/17 3:30 PM
Magistrate Notice/Consent Form furnished. (lgd) |
|
4 | 4
misc
Clerk's Order PLRA Initial Fee
Wed 04/17 3:28 PM
CLERK'S ORDER re PLRA Initial Fee directing Benton County Detention Center to collect from petitioner's prison account an initial partial filing fee of $5; thereafter to collect monthly payments from petitioner's prison account in amount equal to 20% of preceding month's income credited to account until $ 350 filing fee is paid in full (cc: Sheriff, Benton County Detention Center). (lgd) |
|
3 | 3
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (42:1983) Order - PC Complaint 42:1983 - Initial Order Directing Pleading to be Filed
Wed 04/17 3:04 PM
ORDER directing the Clerk to file the in forma pauperis (IFP) application and complaint submitted by the Plaintiff; GRANTING2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (42:1983). Pursuant to the provisions of the Prisoner Litigation Reform Act, the Clerk is directed to collect the filing fee in the amount of $350.00 from the Plaintiff. Plaintiff is advised that he is required to immediately inform the Court of any change of address. If Plaintiff is transferred to another jail or prison or released, he shall have 30 days from the date of transfer or release in which to notify the Court of the new address. Plaintiff shall submit a change of address on a separate piece of paper entitled Notice to the Court of Change of Address and not include any motions or otherwise request relief in this document. The notice shall contain only information pertaining to the address change. The case will be subject to dismissal if Plaintiff fails to inform the Court of an address change; DIRECTING that an Amended Complaint be filed.( Amended Complaint due by 5/8/2024) Signed by Honorable Christy D. Comstock on April 17, 2024. (lgd) |
|
2 | 2
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis (42:1983)
Wed 04/17 2:55 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (42:1983) by Jarrod Ketcher. Motions referred to Mark E. Ford.(lgd) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint Referred (42:1983)
Wed 04/17 2:49 PM
COMPLAINT REFERRED (42:1983) against Venasula, White, filed by Jarrod Ketcher.(lgd) |