Akhmatov v. Mayorkas et al
California Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Jon S Tigar |
Case #: | 4:24-cv-02283 |
Nature of Suit | 465 Immigration - Other Immigration Actions |
Cause | 28:1361 Petition for Writ of Mandamus |
Case Filed: | Apr 17, 2024 |
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 17, 2024 4:08 PM PDT |
Defendant
Andrew Davidson
|
|
Defendant
Matthew Emrich
|
|
Defendant
Ur Jaddou
|
|
Defendant
Ted Kim
|
|
Defendant
Alejandro Mayorkas
|
|
Defendant
San Francisco Asylum Office
|
|
Defendant
United States Citizenship And Immigration Services (USCIS)
|
|
Plaintiff
Arstanbek Akhmatov
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/30/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Tuesday, April 30, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
service
Summons Issued as to USA
Tue 04/30 12:57 PM
Summons Issued as to Andrew Davidson, Matthew Emrich, Ur Jaddou, Ted Kim, Alejandro Mayorkas, San Francisco Asylum Office, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (krp, COURT STAFF) |
|
Monday, April 29, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Proposed Summons
Mon 04/29 5:05 PM
Proposed Summons. (Minas, Arthur) |
|
Tuesday, April 23, 2024 | ||
utility
Electronic Filing Error
Tue 04/23 12:52 PM
[LINK:Electronic filing error] . ***For the Proposed Summons, the address listed for plaintiff's attorney does not match the docket sheet. Please correct and re-file in its entirety.*** Re:4 Proposed Summons filed by Arstanbek Akhmatov (krp, COURT STAFF) |
||
Monday, April 22, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures
Mon 04/22 4:08 PM
Certificate of Interested Entities by Arstanbek Akhmatov (Minas, Arthur) |
|
4 | 4
misc
Proposed Summons
Mon 04/22 4:06 PM
Proposed Summons. (Minas, Arthur) |
|
Wednesday, April 17, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
order
Immigration Mandamus Case Procedural Order
Wed 04/17 6:37 PM
Immigration Mandamus Case Procedural Order. (krp, COURT STAFF) |
|
2 | 2
utility
~Util - Case Assigned by Intake
Wed 04/17 2:46 PM
Case assigned to Judge Jon S. Tigar. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (smc, COURT STAFF) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 04/17 11:36 AM
COMPLAINT against Andrew Davidson, Matthew Emrich, Ur Jaddou, Ted Kim, Alejandro Mayorkas, San Francisco Asylum Office, United States Citizenship And Immigration Services (USCIS) ( Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ACANDC-19328270.). Filed by Arstanbek Akhmatov.(Minas, Arthur) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 11 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 12 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 13 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 14 Exhibit |