Graham v. Future Motion, Inc.
Consolidated
Lead case: 5:23-md-03087
Lead case: 5:23-md-03087
California Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Beth Labson Freeman |
Case #: | 5:24-cv-02297 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Apr 17, 2024 |
Case in other court: | Florida Southern, 9:24-cv-80285 |
Last checked: Thursday Apr 18, 2024 8:06 PM PDT |
Defendant
Future Motion, Inc.
|
|
Plaintiff
Kyle Graham
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/30/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Wednesday, April 17, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
transfer
Case Transferred In - District Transfer
Wed 04/17 9:57 PM
Case transferred in from District of Florida Southern; Case Number 9:24-cv-80285. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |
|
utility
MDL Member Case
Wed 04/17 9:59 PM
MEMBER CASE OPENED MDL 3087: District of Florida Southern, 9:24-cv-80285, Graham v. Future Motion, Inc., Opened in California Northern District as 5:24-cv-02297-BLF pursuant to Conditional Transfer Order 9 cc: JPMDL (krp, COURT STAFF) |
||
Tuesday, April 16, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
order
ECF Transfer In - converted docket entry
Wed 04/17 3:05 PM
CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-9) transferring case to the Northern District of California re: MDL 3087 for consolidated pretrial proceedings pursuant to 28 USC 1407 and assigned to the Honorable Beth Labson Freeman. (Signed by Tiffaney Pete, Clerk of the Panel). (jas) |
|
utility
Terminate Civil Case
Wed 04/17 3:07 PM
Civil Case Closed and Transferred to the Northern District of California re7 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-9) transferring case to the Northern District of California re: MDL 3087. (jas) |
||
Friday, April 12, 2024 | ||
6 | 6 Courtesy Copy of CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-9) transferring case to the Northern District of California re: MDL 3087 for consolidated pretrial proceedings pursuant to 28 USC 1407 and assigned to the Honorable Beth Labson Freeman. (Signed by Tiffaney Pete, Clerk of the Panel). (jas) | |
Thursday, March 14, 2024 | ||
5 | 5 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Future Motion, Inc., filed by Kyle Graham.(Landau, Matthew) | |
4 | 4 PAPERLESS ORDER REGARDING JURISDICTIONAL DEFECT. Plaintiff Kyle Graham filed this action on the basis of diversity jurisdiction. But the Complaint fails to contain allegations that satisfy this Court that it has diversity jurisdiction over this action. Graham alleges that he is "suis juris and resides in the state of Oregon." (DE1 at 1). However, an individual's residence is not the same as an individual's citizenship. See Travaglio v. Am. Express Co. , 735 F.3d 1266, 1269 (11th Cir. 2013) (explaining that to allege citizenship, "[r]esidence alone is not enough."). Plaintiff shall file an amended complaint curing these deficiencies by March 18, 2024 . Failure to timely comply with this Order may result in dismissal of the Complaint without prejudice. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 3/14/2024. (kid) | |
Wednesday, March 13, 2024 | ||
3 | 3 Summons Issued as to Future Motion, Inc. (wce) | |
2 | 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge William Matthewman is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (wce) | |
1 | 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 405.00 receipt number AFLSDC-17365275, filed by Kyle graham.(Landau, Matthew) | |
Att: 1 Summon(s), | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet |