Babbino et al v. Future Motion, Inc.
Consolidated
Lead case: 5:23-md-03087
Lead case: 5:23-md-03087
California Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Beth Labson Freeman |
Case #: | 5:24-cv-02298 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1331 Fed. Question: Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Apr 17, 2024 |
Case in other court: | Florida Southern, 9:24-cv-80280 |
Last checked: Thursday Apr 18, 2024 8:06 PM PDT |
Defendant
Future Motion, Inc.
|
|
Plaintiff
Charles Robert Babbino
2138 Rockmart Loop
Taveres, FL 32778 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Christina Babbino
2138 Rockmart Loop
Tavares, FL 32778 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 43 minutes ago |
Wednesday, April 17, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
transfer
Case Transferred In - District Transfer
Wed 04/17 10:14 PM
Case transferred in from District of Florida Southern; Case Number 9:24-cv-80280. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |
|
utility
MDL Member Case
Wed 04/17 10:16 PM
MEMBER CASE OPENED MDL 3087: District of Florida Southern, 9:24-cv-80280, Babbino et al v. Future Motion, Inc., Opened in California Northern District as 5:24-cv-02298-BLF pursuant to Conditional Transfer Order 9 cc: JPMDL (krp, COURT STAFF) |
||
Tuesday, April 16, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
order
ECF Transfer In - converted docket entry
Wed 04/17 2:57 PM
CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-9) transferring case to the Northern District of California re: MDL 3087 for consolidated pretrial proceedings pursuant to 28 USC 1407 and assigned to the Honorable Beth Labson Freeman. (Signed by Tiffaney Pete, Clerk of the Panel). (jas) |
|
Friday, April 12, 2024 | ||
6 | 6 Courtesy Copy of CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-9) transferring case to the Northern District of California re: MDL 3087 for consolidated pretrial proceedings pursuant to 28 USC 1407 and assigned to the Honorable Beth Labson Freeman. (Signed by Tiffaney Pete, Clerk of the Panel). (jas) | |
Thursday, March 14, 2024 | ||
5 | 5 Standing Discovery Order for Magistrate Judge Bruce Reinhart. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart on 3/14/2024. See attached document for full details. (pc) | |
Wednesday, March 13, 2024 | ||
4 | 4 ORDER OF REFERENCE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE AND ORDER OF COURT-MANDATED REQUIREMENTS ON SERVICE, DEFAULTS, AND JOINT SCHEDULING REPORTS Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 3/13/2024. See attached document for full details. (pc) | |
Tuesday, March 12, 2024 | ||
3 | 3 Summons Issued as to Future Motion, Inc.. (pc) | |
2 | 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Robin L. Rosenberg and Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (pc) | |
1 | 1 COMPLAINT against Christina Babbino, Charles Robert Babbino. Filing fees $ 405.00 receipt number AFLSDC-17363090, filed by Christina Babbino, Charles Robert Babbino.(Landau, Matthew) | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Summon(s) |