Neratko v. Future Motion, Inc.
Consolidated
Lead case: 5:23-md-03087
Lead case: 5:23-md-03087
California Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Beth Labson Freeman |
Case #: | 5:24-cv-02303 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Apr 17, 2024 |
Case in other court: | New York Western, 1:24-cv-00292 |
Last checked: Thursday Apr 18, 2024 8:07 PM PDT |
Defendant
Future Motion, Inc.
|
|
Plaintiff
Joseph Neratko
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/30/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Wednesday, April 17, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
transfer
Case Transferred In - District Transfer
Wed 04/17 11:01 PM
Case transferred in from District of New York Western; Case Number 1:24-cv-00292. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |
|
3 | 3
2
pgs
order
Order
Wed 04/17 1:30 PM
MULTIDISTRICT LITIGATION CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER transferring the action to the Northern District of California. Signed by Tiffaney D. Pete, Clerk of the Panel on 4/11/24. (SG) |
|
utility
MDL Member Case
Wed 04/17 11:04 PM
MEMBER CASE OPENED MDL 3087: District of New York Western, 1:24-cv-00292, Neratko v. Future Motion, Inc., Opened in California Northern District as 5:24-cv-02303-BLF pursuant to Conditional Transfer Order 9 cc: JPMDL (krp, COURT STAFF) |
||
Monday, April 01, 2024 | ||
2 | 2 Summons Issued as to Future Motion, Inc. (TMK) | |
Case Assigned to Hon. John L. Sinatra, Jr. Notification to Chambers of on-line civil case opening. (TMK) | ||
AUTOMATIC REFERRAL TO MEDIATION Pursuant to Section 2.1(A) of the Plan for Alternative Dispute Resolution in the United States District Court for the Western District of New York (the ADR Plan), this case is automatically referred to ADR. To access the ADR Plan and for inquiries regarding the Court's ADR Program please review the Court's[LINK:ADR webpage] and/or contact the Court's ADR Administrator at[LINK:adrprogram@nywd.uscourts.gov] .' Prior to the Local Rule 16 scheduling conference, counsel and unrepresented parties shall review the [LINK:ADR Plan] and confer with each other regarding ADR for this case. Unless the parties agree to a different intervention, it is presumed they will participate in mediation. The parties shall be prepared to report on the outcome of their ADR discussion at the scheduling conference, as the initial Scheduling Order for this case will establish ADR deadlines in accordance with the ADR Plan. (TMK) | ||
Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at[LINK:http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms] . (TMK) | ||
Notified Multi-District Litigation Panel of potential tag-along case. (TMK) | ||
Friday, March 29, 2024 | ||
1 | 1 COMPLAINT against Future Motion, Inc. $ 405 receipt number BNYWDC-5142230, filed by Joseph Neratko.(Quinlan, Lawlor) | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Summons |