Baker v. Alliance for Sustainable Energy
Original Case: 1:22-cv-00849
Tenth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:24-cv-01143 |
Type | civil / private |
Nature of Suit | 445 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities-Employment |
Case Filed: | Apr 15, 2024 |
Last checked: Thursday Apr 18, 2024 2:17 AM MDT |
Defendant - Appellee
ALLIANCE FOR SUSTAINABLE ENERGY, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
DONALD BAKER
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/18/2024 2:17 AM MDT |
Monday, April 15, 2024 | ||
[11081902] Civil case docketed. Preliminary record filed. DATE RECEIVED: 04/12/2024 Fee, docketing statement, transcript order form, and notice of appearance due by 04/29/2024 for Donald Baker. Disclosure statement and notice of appearance due on 04/29/2024 for Alliance for Sustainable Energy, LLC 24-1143 | ||
Att: 1 23 pgs Main Document | ||
Att: 2 2 pgs General Docket Letter - Counsel - Civil |