Webster v. Austin et al
Virginia Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Michael S Nachmanoff |
Referred: | William B Porter |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-00636 |
Nature of Suit | 442 Civil Rights - Employment |
Cause | 42:2000e-2 |
Case Filed: | Apr 18, 2024 |
Case in other court: | Maryland, 8:23-cv-01602 |
Last checked: Thursday Apr 18, 2024 3:12 PM EDT |
Defendant
Lloyd J. Austin, III
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Mark Esper
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
NGA's Human Resources Office
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
National Geospatial-Intelligence Agency
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Jack W. Rickert
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Vice Admiral Robert D. Sharp
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kirk E. Webster, Sr.
43184 Gatwick Sq.
Ashburn, VA 20147 |
Docket last updated: 2 hours ago |
Thursday, April 18, 2024 | ||
25 | 25
transfer
Case Transferred In - District Transfer
Thu 04/18 2:20 PM
Case transferred in from District of Maryland; Case Number 8:23-cv-01602. Original file and docket sheet received. |
|
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Thu 04/18 2:39 PM
Case Reassigned to District Judge Michael S Nachmanoff. District Judge Anthony J Trenga no longer assigned to the case. (swil) |
||
notice
Notification of Transfer
Thu 04/18 3:11 PM
Notification of transfer of civil case from the District of Maryland Case No. 8:23cv1602 to the Eastern District of Virginia. (ldab, ) |
||
Wednesday, April 17, 2024 | ||
24 | 24 ORDER granting in part15 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, for Summary Judgment; directing the Clerk of Court to transfer this case to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia and, once the case is transferred, to close this case. Signed by Judge Peter J. Messitte on 4/16/2024. (ols, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from Maryland on 4/18/2024.] | |
23 | 23 9 pgs MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Peter J. Messitte on 4/16/2024. (ols, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from Maryland on 4/18/2024.] | |
Monday, January 29, 2024 | ||
22 | 22 REPLY to Response to Motion re20 MOTION for Leave to File filed by Kirk E. Webster, Sr. (ols, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from Maryland on 4/18/2024.] | |
Att: 1 Envelope | ||
Wednesday, January 24, 2024 | ||
21 | 21 RESPONSE in Opposition re20 MOTION for Leave to File Surreply filed by Lloyd J. Austin, III, Mark Esper, NGA's Human Resources Office, National Geospatial-Intelligence Agency, Jack W. Rickert, Robert D. Sharp.(Wilson, Michael) [Transferred from Maryland on 4/18/2024.] | |
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Monday, January 22, 2024 | ||
20 | 20 MOTION for Leave to File Surreply by Kirk E. Webster, Sr (ols, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from Maryland on 4/18/2024.] | |
Att: 1 Proposed Surreply, | ||
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 3 Envelope | ||
Thursday, January 18, 2024 | ||
19 | 19 RETURN DOCUMENT ORDER. Signed by Judge Peter J. Messitte on 1/18/2024. (c/m p 1/18/24 ols, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from Maryland on 4/18/2024.] | |
Att: 1 First Page of Returned Document | ||
Tuesday, January 09, 2024 | ||
18 | 18 REPLY to Response to Motion re15 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , or in the Alternative, Motion for Summary Judgment MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION to Change Venue filed by Lloyd J. Austin, III, Mark Esper, NGA's Human Resources Office, National Geospatial-Intelligence Agency, Jack W. Rickert, Robert D. Sharp.(Wilson, Michael) [Transferred from Maryland on 4/18/2024.] | |
Wednesday, December 27, 2023 | ||
17 | 17 RESPONSE in Opposition re15 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , or in the Alternative, Motion for Summary Judgment MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION to Change Venue filed by Kirk E. Webster, Sr.(mg3s, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from Maryland on 4/18/2024.] | |
Att: 1 Exhibit K, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit L | ||
Wednesday, November 29, 2023 | ||
16 | 16 Rule 12/56 notice emailed to Kirk E. Webster, Sr (ols, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from Maryland on 4/18/2024.] | |
15 | 15 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , or in the Alternative, Motion for Summary Judgment , MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , MOTION to Change Venue by Lloyd J. Austin, III, Mark Esper, NGA's Human Resources Office, National Geospatial-Intelligence Agency, Jack W. Rickert, Robert D. Sharp(Wilson, Michael)[Transferred from Maryland on 4/18/2024.] | |
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 2, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 3, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit 4, | ||
Att: 6 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, November 15, 2023 | ||
14 | 14 MOTION to Amend1 Complaint by Kirk E. Webster, Sr (ols, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from Maryland on 4/18/2024.] | |
Att: 1 Proposed Amended Complaint, | ||
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 2, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit 3, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit 4, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit 5, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit 6, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit 7, | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit 8, | ||
Att: 11 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 12 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 13 Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 14 Exhibit D, | ||
Att: 15 Exhibit E, | ||
Att: 16 Exhibit F, | ||
Att: 17 Exhibit G, | ||
Att: 18 Exhibit H, | ||
Att: 19 Exhibit I, | ||
Att: 20 Exhibit J, | ||
Att: 21 Enclosure 1, | ||
Att: 22 Enclosure 2, | ||
Att: 23 Enclosure 3, | ||
Att: 24 Enclosure 4, | ||
Att: 25 Enclosure 5, | ||
Att: 26 Enclosure 6, | ||
Att: 27 Enclosure 7, | ||
Att: 28 Enclosure 8, | ||
Att: 29 Enclosure 9 | ||
Wednesday, October 04, 2023 | ||
13 | 13 Summons Returned Executed (Summons Proof of Service Delivery for Erek L. Barron) by Kirk E. Webster, Sr(mg3s, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from Maryland on 4/18/2024.] | |
Att: 1 Envelope | ||
Tuesday, September 26, 2023 | ||
12 | 12 Summons Reissued as to U.S. Attorney (ols, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from Maryland on 4/18/2024.] | |
Tuesday, September 19, 2023 | ||
11 | 11 ORDER denying8 Plaintiff's Motion for Default and Default Judgment Pursuant to Rule 55; denying9 Plaintiff's Motion to Correct Defective Service; directing Plaintiff to file a new summons with the Clerk of Court. Signed by Judge Peter J. Messitte on 9/19/2023. (c/m p 9/19/23 ols, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from Maryland on 4/18/2024.] | |
Tuesday, September 05, 2023 | ||
10 | 10 NOTICE by Lloyd J. Austin, III, Mark Esper, NGA's Human Resources Office, National Geospatial-Intelligence Agency, Jack W. Rickert, Robert D. Sharp re1 Complaint,, Regarding Failure of Service(Wilson, Michael) [Transferred from Maryland on 4/18/2024.] | |
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 to Notice | ||
Friday, September 01, 2023 | ||
9 | 9 MOTION to Correct Defective Service by Kirk E. Webster, Sr (ols, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from Maryland on 4/18/2024.] | |
Att: 1 Attachment, | ||
Att: 2 Envelope | ||
Thursday, August 31, 2023 | ||
8 | 8 MOTION for Default Judgment by Kirk E. Webster, Sr (ols, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from Maryland on 4/18/2024.] | |
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, July 11, 2023 | ||
7 | 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kirk E. Webster, Sr. Lloyd J. Austin, III served on 6/29/2023, answer due 8/28/2023. (ols, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from Maryland on 4/18/2024.] | |
Att: 1 Green Return Cards, | ||
Att: 2 Envelope | ||
Thursday, June 29, 2023 | ||
6 | 6 Consent to receive notice and service electronically by Kirk E. Webster, Sr. The Court recommends that all documents received electronically be printed or saved for future reference.(bas, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from Maryland on 4/18/2024.] | |
Att: 1 Envelope | ||
Tuesday, June 20, 2023 | ||
5 | 5 Summons Issued 60 days as to Lloyd J. Austin, III, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (c/m p 6/20/23 ols, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from Maryland on 4/18/2024.] | |
4 | 4 ORDER directing that the Clerk shall take all necessary steps to issue summons and to return summons to Plaintiff. Signed by Judge Peter J. Messitte on 6/20/2023. (c/m p 6/20/2023 ols, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from Maryland on 4/18/2024.] | |
Friday, June 16, 2023 | ||
3 | 3 NOTICE by Kirk E. Webster, Sr Summons for U.S. Attorney, U.S. Attorney General and Lloyd J. Austin re1 Complaint (ols, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from Maryland on 4/18/2024.] | |
Att: 1 Envelope | ||
Wednesday, June 14, 2023 | ||
2 | 2 New Case Notification Letter sent to Kirk E. Webster, Sr. (c/m p 6/14/23 ols, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from Maryland on 4/18/2024.] | |
1 | 1 COMPLAINT against Lloyd J. Austin, III, Mark Esper, NGA's Human Resources Office, National Geospatial-Intelligence Agency, Jack W. Rickert, Robert D. Sharp ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 1117.), filed by Kirk E. Webster, Sr. (ols, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from Maryland on 4/18/2024.] | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit D, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit E, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit F, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit G, | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit H, | ||
Att: 11 Exhibit I, | ||
Att: 12 Attachment Office of Personnel Management Letter, | ||
Att: 13 Exhibit J, | ||
Att: 14 Enclosure 1, | ||
Att: 15 Enclosure 2, | ||
Att: 16 Enclosure 3, | ||
Att: 17 Enclosure 4, | ||
Att: 18 Enclosure 5, | ||
Att: 19 Enclosure 6, | ||
Att: 20 Enclosure 7, | ||
Att: 21 Enclosure 8, | ||
Att: 22 Enclosure 9 |