Haptic, Inc. v. Apple, Inc.
California Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Lisa J Cisneros |
Case #: | 3:24-cv-02296 |
Nature of Suit | 830 Property Rights - Patent |
Cause | 35:271 Patent Infringement |
Case Filed: | Apr 18, 2024 |
Case in other court: | Texas Western, 1:23-cv-01351 |
Last checked: Thursday Apr 18, 2024 3:07 PM PDT |
Defendant
Apple, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Haptic, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/30/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Thursday, April 18, 2024 | ||
47 | 47
oth_evt
Clerk's Notice re: Consent or Declination
Thu 04/18 2:49 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff and Defendant shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at:[LINK:http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms] . Consent/Declination due by 5/2/2024. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (bns, COURT STAFF) |
|
46 | 46
order
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines
Thu 04/18 2:07 PM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 7/11/2024. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/18/2024 at 01:30 PM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only. (gba, COURT STAFF) |
|
45 | 45
transfer
Case Transferred In - District Transfer
Thu 04/18 2:02 PM
Case transferred in from District of Texas Western; Case Number 1:23-cv-01351. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |
|
Monday, April 15, 2024 | ||
44 | 44 ORDER GRANTING24 Motion to Transfer Venue. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this case is TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Northern District of California. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (cc3) | |
Sunday, April 14, 2024 | ||
Case reassigned to Judge Robert Pitman. Judge Docket II - Austin no longer assigned to the case. (cc3) | ||
Friday, April 12, 2024 | ||
43 | 43 NOTICE Regarding Redaction of Sealed Order by Apple, Inc. re42 Sealed Order (Kete, Joy) | |
Monday, April 08, 2024 | ||
42 | 42 Sealed Order. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (cc3) | |
Friday, March 15, 2024 | ||
41 | 41 REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Apple, Inc., re38 MOTION to Stay Case Pending Resolution of Apple's Motion to Transfer filed by Defendant Apple, Inc. (Denning, Roger) | |
Monday, March 11, 2024 | ||
40 | 40 Rule 26(f) Discovery Report/Case Management Plan by Haptic, Inc..(Melton, Brian) | |
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Proposed Scheduling Order | ||
Friday, March 08, 2024 | ||
39 | 39 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Haptic, Inc., re38 MOTION to Stay Case Pending Resolution of Apple's Motion to Transfer filed by Defendant Apple, Inc.(Melton, Brian) | |
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order | ||
Friday, March 01, 2024 | ||
38 | 38 MOTION to Stay Case Pending Resolution of Apple's Motion to Transfer by Apple, Inc..(Denning, Roger) | |
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, February 28, 2024 | ||
37 | 37 Redacted Copy Apple Inc.'s Reply in Support of Its Motion to Transfer Venue to the Northern District of California of34 Sealed Document by Apple, Inc.. (Kete, Joy) | |
Tuesday, February 27, 2024 | ||
36 | 36 Redacted Copy of Plaintiff Haptic Inc.'s Opposition to Apple's Motion to Transfer Venue to the Northern District of California and Alternative Motion for Leave for Venue Discovery of31 Sealed Document, by Haptic, Inc.. (Melton, Brian) | |
35 | 35 ORDER GRANTING32 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to SAMUEL DREZDZON. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Registration is managed by the PACER Service Center Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (cc3) | |
Thursday, February 22, 2024 | ||
34 | 34 Sealed Document filed (cc3) (cc3). | |
Att: 1 (2/22/2024) declaration | ||
Wednesday, February 21, 2024 | ||
Text Order GRANTING33 Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document entered by Judge Robert Pitman. IT IS ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall file the unredacted version of Apple's Reply in Support of Its Motion To Transfer, (Dkt. 33-1), and the declaration of Kishansingh Balgobin, (Dkt. 33-2), UNDER SEAL. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Apple shall file an unsealed, redacted version of the Reply only on or before February 28, 2024. There is no need to file a redacted copy of the declaration. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (sslc) | ||
Tuesday, February 20, 2024 | ||
33 | 33 Unopposed Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (Kete, Joy) | |
Att: 1 Brief SEALED DOCUMENT, | ||
Att: 2 Affidavit SEALED DOCUMENT, | ||
Att: 3 SEALED DOCUMENT, | ||
Att: 4 Proposed Order SEALED DOCUMENT | ||
32 | 32 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Rocco Magni for Samuel Drezdzon ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number ATXWDC-18434102) by on behalf of Haptic, Inc..(Magni, Rocco) | |
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, February 13, 2024 | ||
31 | 31 *Sealed* Plaintiff Haptic Inc.'s Opposition to Apple's Motion to Transfer Venue to the Northern District of California and Alternative Motion for Leave for Venue Discovery. (pg) | |
Att: 1 Declaration of Jake Boshernitzan, | ||
Att: 2 Declaration of John Boyd, | ||
Att: 3 Declaration of Ohad Nezer, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 6 *SEALED* Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 7 *SEALED* Exhibit D, | ||
Att: 8 *SEALED* Exhibit E, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit F, | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit G, | ||
Att: 11 Exhibit H | ||
Text Order GRANTING30 Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document entered by Judge Robert Pitman. IT IS ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall file the unredacted version of Plaintiff Haptic Inc.'s Response to Defendant Apple Inc.'s Motion to Transfer, (Dkt. 30-1), and its attached exhibits, (Dkts. 30-2 to 30-12), UNDER SEAL. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Haptic Inc. shall file an unsealed, redacted version of the Response only on or before February 27, 2024. There is no need to file redacted exhibits. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jmlc) | ||
Monday, February 12, 2024 | ||
30 | 30 Unopposed Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (Melton, Brian) | |
Att: 1 Sealed Plaintiff Haptic Inc.'s Opposition to Apple's Motion to Transfer Venue to the Northern District of California, | ||
Att: 2 Declaration of Jake Boshernitzan, | ||
Att: 3 Declaration of John Boyd, | ||
Att: 4 Declaration of Ohad Nezer, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit D, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit E, | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit F, | ||
Att: 11 Exhibit G, | ||
Att: 12 Exhibit H, | ||
Att: 13 Proposed Order | ||
29 | 29 REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Apple, Inc., re13 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Defendant Apple, Inc.(Denning, Roger) | |
Att: 1 Affidavit of Seth M. Sproul, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit C | ||
Tuesday, February 06, 2024 | ||
28 | 28 Redacted Copy of24 Sealed Motion filed by Apple, Inc.. (Kete, Joy) | |
Monday, February 05, 2024 | ||
27 | 27 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Haptic, Inc., re13 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Defendant Apple, Inc.(Melton, Brian) | |
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Friday, February 02, 2024 | ||
26 | 26 ORDER GRANTING25 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Shaleez E. Ozlat for Haptic, Inc. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Registration is managed by the PACER Service Center. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (jv2) | |
Wednesday, January 31, 2024 | ||
25 | 25 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Rocco Magni for Shaleez E. Ozlat ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number ATXWDC-18367110) by on behalf of Haptic, Inc..(Magni, Rocco) | |
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, January 30, 2024 | ||
24 | 24 Sealed Motion filed: Defendant Apple Inc.'s Opposed Motion to Transfer Venue to the Northern District of California (jv2) | |
Att: 1 Sealed Exhibit F, | ||
Att: 2 Sealed Declaration of Adam Norwood, | ||
Att: 3 Sealed Declaration of Catherine Spevak, | ||
Att: 4 Sealed Declaration of Erik Perez, | ||
Att: 5 Sealed Declaration of Jacqueline T. Harlow, | ||
Att: 6 Sealed Declaration Maxime Veron, | ||
Att: 7 Sealed Declaration of Paul Ferrell, | ||
Att: 8 Sealed Declaration of Varun Maudgalya | ||
23 | 23 Second Pro Hac Vice Letter directed to Shaleez E. Ozlat of Susan Godfrey LLP. (jv2) | |
Text Order GRANTING20 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response entered by Judge Robert Pitman. IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiff shall respond to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss on or before February 5, 2024. The parties are reminded to file requests for time extensions as motions. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jmlc) | ||
Text Order GRANTING21 Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document entered by Judge Robert Pitman. IT IS ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall file the unredacted version of Apples Motion to Transfer, (Dkt. 21-1), and its attached exhibits, (Dkts. 21-2 to 21-9), UNDER SEAL. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Apple shall file an unsealed, redacted version of the Motion to Transfer only on or before February 6, 2024. There is no need to file redacted exhibits. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jmlc) | ||
Notice of Correction: re22 Affidavit in Support. The docket clerk has modified the docket entry relationship to link Dkt. 22 to Dkt. 24. (jv2) | ||
Monday, January 29, 2024 | ||
22 | 22 AFFIDAVIT in Support of24 Sealed Motion filed: Defendant Apple Inc.'s Opposed Motion to Transfer Venue to the Northern District of California(Kete, Joy) Modified on 1/30/2024 (jv2). | |
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit E, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit G, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit H, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit I, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit J, | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit K, | ||
Att: 11 Exhibit L, | ||
Att: 12 Exhibit M, | ||
Att: 13 Exhibit N, | ||
Att: 14 Exhibit O, | ||
Att: 15 Exhibit P, | ||
Att: 16 Exhibit Q, | ||
Att: 17 Proposed Order | ||
21 | 21 Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (Kete, Joy) | |
Att: 1 SEALED DOCUMENT, | ||
Att: 2 SEALED DOCUMENT, | ||
Att: 3 SEALED DOCUMENT, | ||
Att: 4 SEALED DOCUMENT, | ||
Att: 5 SEALED DOCUMENT, | ||
Att: 6 SEALED DOCUMENT, | ||
Att: 7 SEALED DOCUMENT, | ||
Att: 8 SEALED DOCUMENT, | ||
Att: 9 SEALED DOCUMENT, | ||
Att: 10 SEALED DOCUMENT, | ||
Att: 11 SEALED DOCUMENT | ||
20 | 20 NOTICE of Unopposed Extension Regarding Plaintiff's Time to File Response to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss by Haptic, Inc. re13 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Factor, Ace) Modified on 1/30/2024 to add gavel pursuant to chamber's instructions (jv2). | |
Friday, January 26, 2024 | ||
19 | 19 ORDER GRANTING18 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Seth M. Sproul for Apple, Inc. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Registration is managed by the PACER Service Center. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (jv2) | |
Thursday, January 25, 2024 | ||
18 | 18 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Roger Allen Denning for Seth M. Sproul ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number ATXWDC-18348367) by on behalf of Apple, Inc.. (Denning, Roger) | |
Tuesday, January 23, 2024 | ||
17 | 17 ORDER GRANTING16 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Qiuyi Wu for Apple, Inc. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Registration is managed by the PACER Service Center. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (jv2) | |
Friday, January 19, 2024 | ||
16 | 16 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Roger Allen Denning for Qiuyi Wu ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number ATXWDC-18325337) by on behalf of Apple, Inc.. (Denning, Roger) | |
Thursday, January 18, 2024 | ||
15 | 15 ORDER GRANTING12 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Joy B. Kete for Apple, Inc. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Registration is managed by the PACER Service Center. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (jv2) | |
Tuesday, January 16, 2024 | ||
14 | 14 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Apple, Inc.. (Denning, Roger) | |
13 | 13 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Apple, Inc..(Denning, Roger) | |
Att: 1 Declaration of Roger A. Denning, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 4 Proposed Order | ||
12 | 12 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Roger Allen Denning for Joy B. Kete ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number ATXWDC-18307117) by on behalf of Apple, Inc.. (Denning, Roger) | |
11 | 11 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Roger Allen Denning on behalf of Apple, Inc.. Attorney Roger Allen Denning added to party Apple, Inc.(pty:dft) (Denning, Roger) | |
Tuesday, November 21, 2023 | ||
Text Order GRANTING10 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer entered by Judge Robert Pitman. It is ordered that Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's complaint on or before January 16, 2024. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jmlc) | ||
Set/Reset Deadlines: Apple, Inc. answer due 1/16/2024. (jv2) | ||
Monday, November 20, 2023 | ||
10 | 10 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint by Apple, Inc..(Wingard, Steven) | |
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Friday, November 10, 2023 | ||
9 | 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Haptic, Inc.. Apple, Inc. served on 11/9/2023, answer due 11/30/2023. (Factor, Ace) | |
Thursday, November 09, 2023 | ||
8 | 8 ORDER GRANTING7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Ace M. Factor for Haptic, Inc. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Registration is managed by the PACER Service Center. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (jv2) | |
Tuesday, November 07, 2023 | ||
7 | 7 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Brian D. Melton on behalf of Ace M. Factor ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number ATXWDC-18071508) by on behalf of Haptic, Inc..(Melton, Brian) | |
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Monday, November 06, 2023 | ||
6 | 6 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Haptic, Inc.. (Melton, Brian) | |
5 | 5 Summons Issued as to Apple, Inc.. (kp) | |
4 | 4 Report on Patent/Trademark sent to U.S. Patent and Trademark Office along with a copy of the complaint. (kp) | |
3 | 3 Pro Hac Vice Letter to Ace M. Factor and Shaleez E. Ozlat. (kp) | |
2 | 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Haptic Inc. (Melton, Brian) | |
1 | 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATXWDC-18066916), filed by Haptic Inc.(Melton, Brian) | |
Att: 1 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2, | ||
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
Case assigned to Judge Docket II - Austin. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (kp) | ||
If ordered by the court, all referrals and consents in this case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Hightower. (kp) | ||
DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Haptic, Inc.. (kp) |