Rhode Island District Court
Judge:John J Mcconnell, Jr
Referred: Lincoln D Almond
Case #: 1:24-cv-00155
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Apr 18, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Oct 15, 2024 4:27 AM EDT
Defendant
City of Pawtucket
Represented By
Jeffrey M DeSisto
Desisto Law LLC
contact info
Marc DeSisto
Desisto Law LLC
contact info
Defendant
Daniel Dolan
Represented By
Michael J. Colucci
Olenn & Penza, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Joseph Greco
Represented By
James P. Howe
James P. Howe, Inc
contact info
Plaintiff
Vincent Greco
Represented By
James P. Howe
James P. Howe, Inc
contact info
Plaintiff
Dominic Vincent
Represented By
James P. Howe
James P. Howe, Inc
contact info

GPO Oct 31 2024
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 12 Motion to Dismiss; granting 14 Motion to Amend Complaint. So Ordered by Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 10/31/2024. (Jackson, Ryan)

Docket last updated: 81 minutes ago
Monday, December 02, 2024
order Order on Motion for Extension of Scheduling Order Deadlines Mon 12/02 12:16 PM
TEXT ORDER granting24 Motion for Extension of Scheduling Order Deadlines. Reset Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 6/1/2025; Joinder of Parties due by 6/1/2025; Factual Discovery to be completed by 11/1/2025; Plaintiff Expert Disclosures shall be made by 12/1/2025; Defendant Expert Disclosures shall be made by 1/2/2026; All Expert Discovery to be completed by 2/2/2026; Dispositive Motions to be filed by 3/4/2026. So Ordered by Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 12/2/2024. (Jackson, Ryan)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 27, 2024
24 24 motion Extension of Scheduling Order Deadlines Wed 11/27 3:59 PM
Assented MOTION for Extension of Scheduling Order Deadlines filed by All Plaintiffs. Responses due by 12/11/2024. (Howe, James)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 12, 2024
23 23 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 11/12 10:20 AM
ANSWER to Complaint (Amended Complaint) by Daniel Dolan.(Colucci, Michael)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 31, 2024
22 22 order Scheduling Order (form attached) Thu 10/31 1:32 PM
PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 12/15/2024; Joinder of Parties due by 12/15/2024; All Factual Discovery to be completed by 5/1/2025; Plaintiff Expert Disclosures shall be made by 6/1/2025; Defendant Expert Disclosures shall be made by 7/1/2025; All Expert Discovery to be completed by 8/1/2025; Dispositive Motions to be filed by 9/3/2025. So Ordered by Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 10/31/2024. (Jackson, Ryan)
Related: [-]
21 21 19 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss Order on Motion to Amend/Correct Thu 10/31 1:30 PM
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part12 Motion to Dismiss; granting14 Motion to Amend Complaint. So Ordered by Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 10/31/2024. (Jackson, Ryan)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 26, 2024
20 20 respm Sur-Reply to Reply to Motion Response Thu 09/26 4:20 PM
SUR-REPLY to Reply to Motion Response re16 Reply to Response filed by All Plaintiffs. (Howe, James)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 20, 2024
order Order on Motion for Leave to File Fri 09/20 4:53 PM
TEXT ORDER granting19 Motion for Leave to File Sur-reply. Sur-reply due by Sur-reply due by 9/27/2024 . So Ordered by Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 9/20/2024. (Simoncelli, Michael)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 19, 2024
19 19 respm Sur-Reply to Reply to Motion Response Thu 09/19 9:50 AM
SUR-REPLY to Reply to Motion Response re16 Reply to Response filed by All Plaintiffs. (Howe, James)
Related: [-]
18 18 respm Reply to Response Thu 09/19 9:45 AM
REPLY to Response re17 Response to Motion Amend Complaint filed by All Plaintiffs. (Howe, James)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 12, 2024
17 17 respm Response to Motion Thu 09/12 2:54 PM
RESPONSE In Opposition to14 First MOTION to Amend/Correct complaint filed by Daniel Dolan. Replies due by 9/19/2024. (Colucci, Michael)
Related: [-]
16 16 respm Reply to Response Thu 09/12 2:53 PM
REPLY to Response re15 Response to Motion filed by Daniel Dolan. (Colucci, Michael)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 11, 2024
15 15 respm Response to Motion Wed 09/11 2:09 PM
First RESPONSE In Opposition to12 MOTION to Dismiss filed by All Plaintiffs. Replies due by 9/18/2024.(Howe, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Supporting Memorandum,
Att: 2 Exhibit,
Att: 3 Exhibit
misc Public Docket Note Wed 09/11 4:00 PM
DOCKET NOTE: Electronic Video Exhibit Received and Maintained in the Clerk's office Regarding:15 Response to Motion. (Hill, Cherelle)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 10, 2024
14 14 motion Amend/Correct Tue 09/10 3:24 PM
First MOTION to Amend/Correct complaint filed by All Plaintiffs. Responses due by 9/24/2024.(Howe, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit amended complaint
Thursday, August 08, 2024
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Thu 08/08 3:48 PM
TEXT ORDER granting13 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to12 Motion to Dismiss; Responses due by 9/11/2024 . So Ordered by Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 8/8/2024. (Jackson, Ryan)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 07, 2024
13 13 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Wed 08/07 12:37 PM
Assented MOTION for an Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to12 MOTION to Dismiss filed by All Plaintiffs. Responses due by 8/21/2024. (Howe, James)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 31, 2024
12 12 motion Dismiss Wed 07/31 2:48 PM
MOTION to Dismiss filed by Daniel Dolan. Responses due by 8/14/2024.(Colucci, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Supporting Memorandum Memorandum of Law,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit A
11 11 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 07/31 2:44 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Michael J. Colucci on behalf of Daniel Dolan (Colucci, Michael)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 29, 2024
10 10 misc Stipulation Mon 07/29 9:38 AM
STIPULATION re1 Complaint filed by Daniel Dolan. (Colucci, Michael)
Related: [-]
order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines Mon 07/29 2:43 PM
TEXT ORDER Entering10 Stipulation Extending Time for Response to1 Complaint filed by Daniel Dolan; Daniel Dolan answer due 8/2/2024. So Ordered by Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 7/29/2024. (Jackson, Ryan)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 17, 2024
order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines Wed 07/17 2:26 PM
TEXT ORDER Entering9 Stipulation for Extension of Time for Daniel Dolan to Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint; Daniel Dolan answer due 7/29/2024. So Ordered by Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 7/17/2024. (Jackson, Ryan)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 15, 2024
9 9 misc Stipulation Mon 07/15 1:06 PM
STIPULATION for Extension of Time for Daniel Dolan to Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint filed by City of Pawtucket. (DeSisto, Marc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 12, 2024
order Order Wed 06/12 1:32 PM
TEXT ORDER Entering7 Stipulation re: Finance Director filed by City of Pawtucket. So Ordered by Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 6/12/2024. (Jackson, Ryan)
Related: [-]
order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines Wed 06/12 1:35 PM
TEXT ORDER Entering8 Stipulation Extending Time to Answer/Respond filed by Vincent Greco, Dominic Vincent, Joseph Greco; Daniel Dolan answer due 7/15/2024. So Ordered by Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 6/12/2024. (Jackson, Ryan)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 11, 2024
8 8 misc Stipulation Tue 06/11 5:04 PM
First STIPULATION filed by All Plaintiffs. (Howe, James)
Related: [-]
7 7 misc Stipulation Tue 06/11 3:15 PM
Joint STIPULATION as to Finance Director filed by City of Pawtucket. (DeSisto, Marc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 05, 2024
6 6 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 06/05 11:24 AM
ANSWER to Complaint by City of Pawtucket.(DeSisto, Marc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 29, 2024
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 05/29 8:19 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey M DeSisto on behalf of City of Pawtucket (DeSisto, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 05/29 8:19 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Marc DeSisto on behalf of City of Pawtucket (DeSisto, Marc)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 19, 2024
3 3 service Summons Issued Fri 04/19 11:37 AM
Summons Issued as to City of Pawtucket, Daniel Dolan.(Hill, Cherelle)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons
2 2 notice Case Opening Notice (Form Attached) Fri 04/19 11:31 AM
CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Hill, Cherelle)
Related: [-]
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Fri 04/19 11:27 AM
Case assigned to Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (Hill, Cherelle)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 18, 2024
1 1 cmp Complaint - New Case Thu 04/18 5:25 PM
COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 405.00, receipt number CRIDC-1985823 ), filed by dominic vincent.(Howe, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet cover sheet,
Att: 2 summons,
Att: 3 summons