wade v. Irving et al
Virginia Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | John A Gibney, Jr |
Case #: | 3:24-cv-00291 |
Nature of Suit | 550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Apr 19, 2024 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 40 minutes ago |
Tuesday, April 23, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
1
pgs
order
Order Reassigning Case
Tue 04/23 11:21 AM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to District Judge John A. Gibney, Jr for all further proceedings. District Judge David J. Novak no longer assigned to case. Signed by District Judge David J. Novak on 4/23/2024. (cgar) |
|
Friday, April 19, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
service
Summons Issued
Fri 04/19 1:13 PM
Summons Issued as to Antionette Irving and John Doe Defendants 1-20. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Please remove the headers and print two duplexed copies of the electronically issued summons for each Defendant. Please serve one copy of the summons and a copy of the Complaint upon the Defendant. Please ensure that your process server returns the service copy (executed or unexecuted) to your attention and electronically file it using the filing events, Summons Returned Executed or Summons Returned Unexecuted . (sbea) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Proposed Summons
Fri 04/19 11:55 AM
Proposed Summons by Carla Wade (Brooks, Thomas). Modified on 4/19/2024. (sbea) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Proposed Summons
Fri 04/19 11:54 AM
Proposed Summons by Carla Wade (Brooks, Thomas) Modified on 4/19/2024. (sbea) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 04/19 11:41 AM
Complaint (Filing Fee: $405, Receipt Number: AVAEDC-9482655), filed by Carla Wade.(Brooks, Thomas). (Clerk replaced Complaint to include Civil Action Number on 4/19/2024). Modified on 4/19/2024. (sbea) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit | ||
utility
Initial Case Assignment
Fri 04/19 12:52 PM
Initial Case Assignment to District Judge David J. Novak. (sbea) |
||
misc
Notice of Correction
Fri 04/19 12:55 PM
Notice of Correction re:1 Complaint,2 -3 Proposed Summons; Clerk modified style of case, changed the case of party names to upper case letters and added party text to the named parties. The "Demand" was amended. No further corrections are necessary. (sbea) |