Sandoval Rodriguez v. Perry et al
Virginia Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Leonie M Brinkema |
Referred: | William B Porter |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-00651 |
Nature of Suit | 463 Immigration - Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee |
Cause | 8:1105(a) Aliens: Habeas Corpus to Release INS Detainee |
Case Filed: | Apr 19, 2024 |
Last checked: Friday Apr 19, 2024 4:09 PM EDT |
Defendant
Attorney General Merrick Garland
Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue NW
Washington, DC 20530 |
|
Defendant
Secretary of DHS ALEJANDRO MAYORKAS
245 Murray Ln., SW Mail Stop 0485
Washington, DC 20528 |
|
Defendant
Superintendent Paul Perry
Caroline Detention Facility 11093 SW Lewis Memorial Dr
Bowling Green, VA 22427 |
|
Petitioner
Jordi Sandoval Rodriguez
|
|
Respondent
Liana Castano
|
Docket last updated: 2 hours ago |
Wednesday, May 01, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
motion
Show Cause
Wed 05/01 11:00 AM
MOTION for Order to Show Cause by Jordi Sandoval Rodriguez.(Appelbaum, Adina) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, April 25, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Certificate of Service
Thu 04/25 8:38 PM
CERTIFICATE of Service re1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2241),,,, by Adina Bassin Appelbaum on behalf of Jordi Sandoval Rodriguez(Appelbaum, Adina) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A | ||
Monday, April 22, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Pro hac vice
Tue 04/23 7:35 AM
ORDER granting2 Motion for Pro hac vice Appointed Daniel Joseph Melo for Jordi Sandoval Rodriguez. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 4/22/2024. (swil) |
|
utility
Remark
Mon 04/22 3:26 PM
No service issued at this time. (Cwel) |
||
Friday, April 19, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
motion
Pro Hac Vice
Fri 04/19 4:47 PM
Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Daniel Joseph Melo and Certification of Local Counsel Adina Bassin Appelbaum Filing fee $ 75, receipt number AVAEDC-9483945. by Jordi Sandoval Rodriguez. (Appelbaum, Adina) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2241)
Fri 04/19 4:16 PM
PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus ( Filing fee $ 5 receipt number I:5402201.240419nyRQ.), filed by Jordi Sandoval Rodriguez.(Appelbaum, Adina) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet civil cover sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit A NTA, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit B Notice of Custody Determination, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibit C Record of sworn statement in AR proceedings, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit Exhibit D ORR release letter, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit Exhibit E I-360 approval, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit Exhibit F YOA, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit Exhibit G EARM Profile I213 narrative, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit Exhibit H IJ Order denying bond, | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit Exhibit I Second admin closure order., | ||
Att: 11 Exhibit Exhibit J Zahedi emails with DO Bevard re release, | ||
Att: 12 Exhibit Exhibit K Zahedi emails with DO Bevard re biometrics, | ||
Att: 13 Exhibit Exhibit L First I485 denial, | ||
Att: 14 Exhibit Exhibit M USCIS service request, | ||
Att: 15 Exhibit Exhibit N Melo emails with WAS ICE, | ||
Att: 16 Exhibit Exhibit O USCIS RFE, | ||
Att: 17 Exhibit Exhibit P USCIS EB I-485 Proc times, | ||
Att: 18 Exhibit Proposed order granting Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus | ||
utility
Initial Case Assignment
Mon 04/22 3:21 PM
Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema and US Magistrate Judge William B. Porter. (Cwel) |