Franklin v. DeJoy
Virginia Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | M Hannah Lauck |
Case #: | 3:24-cv-00287 |
Nature of Suit | 442 Civil Rights - Employment |
Cause | 42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment) |
Case Filed: | Apr 18, 2024 |
Last checked: Saturday Apr 20, 2024 1:09 AM EDT |
Defendant
Louis DeJoy
|
|
Plaintiff
Christian Franklin
2816 Greenwing Lane
Richmond, VA 23231 |
Docket last updated: 4 hours ago |
Monday, April 29, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Mon 04/29 2:19 PM
ORDER that the Application to proceed pro se is provisionally GRANTED (ECF No.1 ). It is further ORDERED that, no later than May 27,2024, Mr. Franklin shall file an Amended Complaint, with a Ghostwriting Form attached, which outlines in simple and straightforward terms why Mr. Franklin thinks that he is entitled to relief and why the Court has jurisdiction over his case. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS (copy of Order and ghost writing form mailed to Pltf as directed). Signed by District Judge M. Hannah Lauck on 4/29/24. (mful, ) |
|
Thursday, April 18, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Fri 04/19 11:36 AM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Christian Franklin.(jenjones, ) |
|
Att: 1 Unmarked Attachments to IFP, | ||
Att: 2 Complaint, | ||
Att: 3 Local Rule 83.1 Certification |