Serpik v. Weedon, et al
Original Case: 5:23-cv-00988
Tenth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:24-cv-06071 |
Type | civil / private |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Apr 18, 2024 |
Last checked: Saturday Apr 20, 2024 2:33 AM MDT |
Defendant - Appellee
JILL WEEDON, individually and in her official capacity
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
GINA WEBB, individually and in her official capacity
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
ANGELA C. MARSEE, individually and in her official capacity
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
MICHELLE K. ROPER, individually and in her official capacity
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
COLBY VAUGHAN, individually and in his official capacity
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
STATE OF OKLAHOMA
|
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
ROMAN VLADIMIROVICH SERPIK, Article III man
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/20/2024 2:33 AM MDT |
Thursday, April 18, 2024 | ||
[11083110] Civil case docketed. Preliminary record filed. DATE RECEIVED: 04/18/2024. Notice of appearance and fee or ifp forms due 05/20/2024 for Roman Vladimirovich Serpik. Notice of appearance due on 05/02/2024 for Angela C. Marsee, Michelle K. Roper, Colby Vaughan, Gina Webb, and Jill Weedon. 24-6071 | ||
Att: 1 15 pgs Prelim ROA | ||
Att: 2 2 pgs Case Opening Pro Civil Habeas |