Original Case: 1:23-cv-05704

Eleventh Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:24-prici-10052
Typeprivate civil / federal question
Nature of Suit230 Real Property - Rent Lease & Ejectment
Case Filed:Jan 03, 2024
Terminated:Apr 17, 2024
Last checked: Monday Apr 22, 2024 6:04 AM EDT
Defendant - Appellant
ELLA LOU DODSON
Represented By
Ella Lou Dodson
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
HOME SFR BORROWER, LLC
Represented By
Matthew Franklin Totten
The Totten Firm, LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/22/2024 6:04 AM EDT
Wednesday, January 03, 2024
CIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant Ella Lou Dodson on 12/29/2023. Fee Status: IFP Granted. Awaiting Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 01/25/2024 as to Appellant Ella Lou Dodson. Awaiting Appellee's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 02/08/2024 as to Appellee Home SFR Borrower, LLC
Related: [-]
Att: 1 3 pgs CIVIL - Notice of Docketing
Att: 2 3 pgs CIVIL - Notice of Docketing
Att: 3 3 pgs Civil Appeal Docketed - Notice of Appeal
Att: 4 8 pgs Petition for Removal DE #3
Att: 5 8 pgs USDC Order DE #4