Dutschmann v. 84 Lumber Company, a limited partnership et al
Illinois Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Staci M Yandle |
Case #: | 3:24-cv-01153 |
Nature of Suit | 368 Torts - Personal Injury - Asbestos Personal Injury Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1442 Petition for Removal |
Case Filed: | Apr 22, 2024 |
Terminated: | Jun 14, 2024 |
Case in other court: | Twentieth Judicial Court, St. Clair County, Illino, 24-LA-0119 |
Last checked: Saturday Jun 08, 2024 4:05 AM CDT |
Cross Claimant
Ace Hardware Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Cross Claimant
Blackmer Pump Company
|
Represented By
|
Cross Claimant
Pneumo Abex, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Cross Claimant
Weil Pump Company Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Cross Defendant
84 Lumber Company
|
|
Cross Defendant
Ace Hardware Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Cross Defendant
Advance Stores Company Incorporated
|
Represented By
|
Cross Defendant
Air & Liquid Systems Corporation
|
|
Cross Defendant
American Biltrite, Inc.
|
|
Cross Defendant
Atwood & Morrill
|
|
Cross Defendant
BW/IP Inc.
|
|
Cross Defendant
Blackmer Pump Company
|
Represented By
|
Cross Defendant
Cameron International Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Cross Defendant
Clark-Reliance Corporation
|
|
Cross Defendant
Conwed Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Cross Defendant
Copes-Vulcan, Inc.
|
|
Cross Defendant
Dap, Inc.
|
|
Cross Defendant
Domco Products Texas, LP
|
|
Cross Defendant
Aubrey Dutschmann
|
Represented By
|
Cross Defendant
FMC Corporation
|
|
Cross Defendant
Federal-Mogul Asbestos Personal Injury Trust
|
|
Cross Defendant
Flowserve Corporation
|
|
Cross Defendant
Flowserve US Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Cross Defendant
Ford Motor Company
|
|
Cross Defendant
Foster Wheeler, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Cross Defendant
GTE Operations Support Incorporated
|
|
Cross Defendant
Gardner Denver, Inc.
|
|
Cross Defendant
General Electric Company
|
Represented By
|
Cross Defendant
Genuine Parts Company
|
|
Cross Defendant
Goodrich Corporation
|
|
Cross Defendant
Goulds Pumps LLC
|
Represented By
|
Cross Defendant
Graybar Electric Company, Inc.
|
|
Cross Defendant
Greene Tweed & Co., Inc.
|
|
Cross Defendant
Grinnell LLC
|
Represented By
|
Cross Defendant
H.B. Fuller Company
|
|
Cross Defendant
IMO Industries Inc.
|
|
Cross Defendant
ITT Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Cross Defendant
Industrial Holdings Corporation
|
|
Cross Defendant
Invensys Systems, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Cross Defendant
John Crane, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Cross Defendant
KCG, Inc.
|
|
Cross Defendant
Kaiser Gypsum Company, Inc.
|
|
Cross Defendant
Kelsey-Hayes Company, Inc.
|
|
Cross Defendant
Lowes Companies, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Cross Defendant
M-D Building Products, Inc.
|
|
Cross Defendant
Mannington Mills Inc.
|
|
Cross Defendant
McCord Corporation
|
|
Cross Defendant
McKesson Corporation
|
|
Cross Defendant
McMaster-Carr Supply Company
|
|
Cross Defendant
Metropolitan Life Insurance Co.
|
|
Cross Defendant
Morse TEC, LLC
|
|
Cross Defendant
PPG Architectural Finishes, Inc.
|
|
Cross Defendant
Paramount Global
|
Represented By
|
Cross Defendant
Pfizer, Inc.
|
|
Cross Defendant
Pneumo Abex, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Cross Defendant
Redco Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Cross Defendant
Rexel USA, Inc.
|
|
Cross Defendant
Schneider Electric USA Inc.
|
|
Cross Defendant
Spirax Sarco, Inc.
|
|
Cross Defendant
The Dow Chemical Company
|
|
Cross Defendant
The Home Depot, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Cross Defendant
Union Carbide Corporation
|
|
Cross Defendant
Vanderbilt Minerals, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Cross Defendant
Velan Valve Corp.
|
|
Cross Defendant
Viking Pump, Inc.
|
|
Cross Defendant
W.W. Grainger, Inc.
|
|
Cross Defendant
Warren Pumps, LLC
|
|
Cross Defendant
Weil Pump Company Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Cross Defendant
Welco Manufacturing Company
|
|
Cross Defendant
Western Auto Supply Co.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Ace Hardware Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Advance Stores Company Incorporated
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
American Biltrite, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
BW/IP Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Blackmer Pump Company
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Cameron International Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Clark-Reliance Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Copes-Vulcan, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
FMC Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Ford Motor Company
|
|
Defendant
GTE Operations Support Incorporated
|
|
Defendant
Gardner Denver, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
General Electric Company
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Goulds Pumps LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Graybar Electric Company, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Greene Tweed & Co., Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Grinnell LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
H.B. Fuller Company
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
ITT Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
John Crane, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
KCG, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Kaiser Gypsum Company, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Kelsey-Hayes Company, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Lowes Companies, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
M-D Building Products, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Mannington Mills Inc.
|
|
Defendant
McCord Corporation
|
|
Defendant
McKesson Corporation
|
|
Defendant
McMaster-Carr Supply Company
|
|
Defendant
Metropolitan Life Insurance Co.
|
|
Defendant
Pfizer, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Rexel USA, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Spirax Sarco, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
The Dow Chemical Company
|
|
Defendant
The Home Depot, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Union Carbide Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Velan Valve Corp.
|
|
Defendant
Viking Pump, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
W.W. Grainger, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Weil Pump Company Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Welco Manufacturing Company
|
|
Defendant
Western Auto Supply Co.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
84 Lumber Company
|
|
Defendant
Air & Liquid Systems Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Atwood & Morrill
|
|
Defendant
Conwed Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Dap, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Domco Products Texas, LP
|
|
Defendant
Federal-Mogul Asbestos Personal Injury Trust
|
|
Defendant
Flowserve Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Flowserve US Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Foster Wheeler, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Genuine Parts Company
|
|
Defendant
Goodrich Corporation
|
|
Defendant
IMO Industries Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Industrial Holdings Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Invensys Systems, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Morse TEC, LLC
|
|
Defendant
PPG Architectural Finishes, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Paramount Global
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Pneumo Abex, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Redco Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Schneider Electric USA Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Vanderbilt Minerals, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Warren Pumps, LLC
|
|
Plaintiff
Aubrey Dutschmann
|
Represented By
|
GPO
Jun 14 2024
ORDER OF REMAND: This case is remanded to Twentieth Judicial Circuit, St. Clair County, Illinois. Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 6/14/2024. (mah) |
Docket last updated: 4 hours ago |
Monday, August 05, 2024 | ||
98 | 98
appeal
USCA Mandate
Mon 08/05 8:59 AM
MANDATE of USCA is DISMISSED as to92 Notice of Appeal filed by Goulds Pumps LLC.(jle) |
|
Att: 1 Certified Order |